Trejo v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Trejo Trejo
Defendant: Samsung SDS America, Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung SDS Global SCL America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co, LTD and Saritek Technical Solutions doing business as Alpatronix and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv01238
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., filed.(Willig, Garett)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alfredo Trejo Trejo, filed.(Bartholet, Dominique)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Saritek Technical Solutions. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alfredo Trejo Trejo, filed.(Bartholet, Dominique)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 6/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL IN RESPONSE TO re: #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., filed.(Willig, Garett)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #4 Stipulation of Dismissal only to Defendants Samsung SDS America, Inc and Samsung SDS Global SCL America, Inc. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Samsung SDS America, Inc. and Samsung SDS Global SCL America, Inc. by Alfredo Trejo Trejo, filed.(Bartholet, Dominique)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION re: Agreement Among Attorneys on Tolling of Limitations and Extension of Time to Answer by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., filed.(Willig, Garett)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st JDC, Harris County, case number 2021-09314 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26280162) filed by Samsung SDS America, Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B, #3 Exhibit EX C, #4 Exhibit EX D, #5 Exhibit EX E, #6 Exhibit EX F, #7 Exhibit Attorney Party List, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Willig, Garett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDS America, Inc
Represented By: Garett Anton Willig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Garett Anton Willig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDS Global SCL America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saritek Technical Solutions doing business as Alpatronix and John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Trejo Trejo
Represented By: Dominique Boussac Bartholet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?