Lewis v. Citadel Servicing Corporation
Plaintiff: Trey Lewis
Defendant: Citadel Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv01294
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 9/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Corrected Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Citadel Servicing Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters filed with Notice of Removal)(Negrin, Robert)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citadel Servicing Corporation, filed.(Negrin, Robert)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st Harris County District Court, case number 202115574 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26302376) filed by Citadel Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of all matters being filed, #3 Errata List of Counsel)(Negrin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Citadel Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trey Lewis
Represented By: LaToya P Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Robert L Negrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?