Lennie Jackson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Lennie Jackson, derivative on behalf of BL Enterprise llc, and Lennie Jackson
Defendant: BL EnterpriseLLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-NCW Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-NCW and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01366
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lennie Jackson re: #4 Notice of Transfer, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
May 26, 2021 Costs Taxed in the amount of $ 402.00 re: #8 Bill of Costs, filed. (dhansen, 4)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support,, filed by Lennie Jackson. (mmapps, 4)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lennie Jackson re: #7 Memorandum and Order,, filed. (mmapps, 4)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Contempt by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Lennie Jackson re: #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (mmapps, 4)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 BILL OF COSTS in total amount $402.00 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss, (Docket Entry No. 5), is granted. Jackson's claims are dismissed with prejudice. All costs are taxed to Jackson. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support,, filed by Lennie Jackson. (mmapps, 4)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal for the following reason: By agreement between Judges. Judge Alfred H Bennett no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ledwards, 4)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-NCW Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-NCW, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court 152nd Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-12301 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26338803) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-NCW Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-NCW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennie Jackson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Jackson, derivative on behalf of BL Enterprise llc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BL EnterpriseLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the MASTR Asset Backed Securities Trust 2007-NCW Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-NCW
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?