Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC v. California Union Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company and California Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01743
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Granting #39 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SEALED REPLY in Support of re: #10 MOTION to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Cooper, J)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cooper, J)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Extension of Defendants' Reply Deadline by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Craig, Samantha)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - Granting #33 Motion for Mark L. Deckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Granting #32 Motion for Aidan M. McCormack to Appear Pro Hac Vice for California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Mark L. Deckman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2021. (Craig, Samantha)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Aidan M. McCormack to Appear Pro Hac Vice by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2021. (Craig, Samantha)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Granting #22 Partially Unopposed MOTION to Seal Dkt. 21 Response to Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is permitted to publicly file a redacted version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; 2. Plaintiff is permitted to file under seal the complete, unredacted version of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; and 3. Plaintiff is permitted to file under seal Exhibits A, H, I, J, and K to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration, which shall be placed under seal of court and not become public or be included in the public records of this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - Granting #29 Motion for John D. Shugrue to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for John D. Shugrue to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2021. (Cooper, J)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Christopher T. Kuleba to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Christopher Kuleba to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2021. (Cooper, J)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Granting #24 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Dkt 23. ORDERED: Defendants are permitted to publicly file a redacted version of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Exhibit 2 to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be placed under seal of court and not become public or be included in the public records of this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration re: #20 Response to Motion,, filed.(Cooper, J)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Dkt 23 by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to re: #10 MOTION to Remand by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Proposed Order) (Vasquez, Cara)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Seal Dkt. 21 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SEALED RESPONSE re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Redacted Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Cooper, J)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Redacted Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Cooper, J)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE Notice of Extenson of Deadlines by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Vasquez, Cara)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE Notice of Extension of Deadlines by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Vasquez, Cara)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Redacted Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Vasquez, Cara)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Granting #14 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED Defendants are permitted to publicly file a redacted version of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration; and Exhibit 3 to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration shall be placed under seal of court and not become public or be included in the public records of this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 5] by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed.(Vasquez, Cara)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC identifying Anadarko Consolidated Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Cooper, J)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Seal does not address the balancing test that courts are to apply when ruling on motions to seal documents filed in the public record. Accordingly, the #8 Unopposed AMENDED Motion to Seal will be DENIED unless by June 18, 2021, Defendants can show good cause for the continuance of the order. ( Miscellaneous Review (Internal Use Only) due by 6/18/2021) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration ; Pltf's Response due by 6/23/2021 re: #5 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed AMENDED #6 MOTION by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, J)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Dkt 5 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Cara)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Order) (Vasquez, Cara)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, filed.(Craig, Samantha)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by California Union Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company identifying Chubb Limited as Corporate Parent, filed.(Vasquez, Cara)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court #281, case number 2021-22882 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26504596) filed by Century Indemnity Company, California Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Vasquez, Cara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC v. California Union Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Represented By: Cara Elizabeth Vasquez
Represented By: Aidan M. McCormack
Represented By: Mark L. Deckman
Represented By: Samantha Anne Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Cara Elizabeth Vasquez
Represented By: Aidan M. McCormack
Represented By: Mark L. Deckman
Represented By: Samantha Anne Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anadarko E&P Onshore LLC
Represented By: J James Cooper
Represented By: Christopher T. Kuleba
Represented By: John D Shugrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?