Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al
Plaintiff: IBEROAMERICANA DE HIDROCARBUROS S.A and Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A.
Defendant: Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Exterran Corporation and Andrew Way
Case Number: 4:2021cv01840
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Pltf and Deft filed a #33 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice stipulating to the dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l). Accordingly, this Court accepts the stipulation and this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice against refiling the same. Each party will bear its own costs...*** STAYED flag cleared...*** Case terminated on 9/7/22. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 6, 2022 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Granting #31 MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney for Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way...*** Attorney Jeremiah J Anderson terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 20, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Withdraw as Attorney by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miles, Craig)
July 15, 2022 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Denying #20 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #19 Order. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 6, 2022 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
February 25, 2022 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Defendants Exterran Energy Solutions LP and Exterran Corp.'s #5 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Andrew Way's #6 Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Pending Arbitration; and Plaintiff's #12 Motion to Remand are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. At the conclusion of the arbitration the movants may move to lift the court's stay and to reinstate or amend their motions. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
December 23, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
October 20, 2021 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Granting #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File Status Report ; Status Report due by 10/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 15, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to File Status Report by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #19 Order,, Terminate Deadlines,, Set/Clear Flags,, filed by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Miles, Craig)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #19 Order,, Terminate Deadlines,, Set/Clear Flags, by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2021. (Oxford, Terrell)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Granting #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. This action is STAYED. The parties will submit a status report on October 15, 2021, and every 60 days thereafter. The October 1, 2021, initial pretrial and scheduling conference is CANCELED. ( Status Report due by 10/15/2021 and every 60 days thereafter )..*** STAYED flag set. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 23, 2021 Filing 18 SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A.. (sanderson, 4) *** filed pursuant to #17 Order of Court
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Granting #15 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, filed by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Miles, Craig)
July 21, 2021 Filing 15 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miles, Craig)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 Opposed RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed.(Oxford, Terrell)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Miles, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines ; IHSA's Response due by 7/6/2021 re: #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. IHSA's response to Exterran's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant Way's Motion toDismiss or, Alternatively, Stay Pending Arbitration is held in abeyance pending this Court's ruling on Defendant Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. The Defendants' response to any motion to remand is held in abeyance pending this Court's ruling on Defendant Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. Deadlines regarding items (b) and (c) above will be set after the Court rules on Exterran's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadlines by Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oxford, Terrell)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miles, Craig)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miles, Craig)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Miles, Craig)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Miles, Craig)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY by Exterran Corporation, Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Andrew Way, filed.(Anderson, Jeremiah)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2021-28031 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26560440) filed by Exterran Energy Solutions, LP, Exterran Corporation, Andrew Way. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Appendix Index, #10 Appendix Acceptance of Service, #11 Appendix State Court Docket, #12 Appendix Declaration, #13 Appendix State Court Notice, #14 Appendix Counsel of Record)(Anderson, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A v. Exterran Energy Solutions, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterran Energy Solutions, LP
Represented By: Jeremiah J Anderson
Represented By: Craig S Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterran Corporation
Represented By: Jeremiah J Anderson
Represented By: Craig S Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Way
Represented By: Jeremiah J Anderson
Represented By: Craig S Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEROAMERICANA DE HIDROCARBUROS S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iberoamericana De Hidrocarburos S.A.
Represented By: Susman Godfrey
Represented By: Terrell Wallace Oxford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?