Mardini v. TXSC Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bashar Mardini
Defendant: TXSC Enterprises, LLC, Hickory Containers Group, Inc., Phil Lopez, Vladimir Pierre Bellon and The Engy Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01859
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by The Engy Group, LLC. (Baughman, Jonathan)
July 21, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bashar Mardini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bush, William)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Phil Lopez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Bush on behalf of Bashar Mardini, filed. (Bush, William)
July 15, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Phil Lopez, filed.(Bush, William)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by The Engy Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baughman, Jonathan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss by The Engy Group, LLC, filed. (Baughman, Jonathan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 STATEMENT of Information in Removed Action by The Engy Group, LLC, filed.(Baughman, Jonathan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Service in Removed Action by The Engy Group, LLC, filed.(Baughman, Jonathan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bashar Mardini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Bush, William)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Bashar Mardini.(Bush, William)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by The Engy Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baughman, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Litigation by The Engy Group, LLC, filed. (Grubb, William)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Baughman on behalf of The Engy Group, LLC, filed. (Baughman, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Szymanski on behalf of The Engy Group, LLC, filed. (Szymanski, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Grubb on behalf of The Engy Group, LLC, filed. (Grubb, William)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 113th Judicial District Court Harris County Texas, case number 2020-02884 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26566591) filed by The Engy Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baughman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mardini v. TXSC Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXSC Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Brice Barret Beale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickory Containers Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladimir Pierre Bellon
Represented By: Brice Barret Beale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Engy Group, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D Baughman
Represented By: William Kenneth Grubb
Represented By: Michael G. Szymanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bashar Mardini
Represented By: Steven Bien Tran
Represented By: William S Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?