Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. v. Republic of Haiti et al
Plaintiff: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.
Defendant: Republic of Haiti and Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement
Garnishee: BB Energy USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01953
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery from Garnishee, filed by BB Energy USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ponig, Christina)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, Republic of Haiti. Issued summons by FedEx International 8079 9718 0688 and 8079 9718 0677, filed.(gclair, 4)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, ; Motion-related deadline set re: #25 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery from Garnishee.( Responses due by 8/13/2021., Replies due by 8/17/2021)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Letter to Judge Regarding Discovery by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Keith)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to #25 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery from Garnishee by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by BB Energy / Christina Ponig for Transcript of Motion Hearing, 07/23/2021, Hon. Keith P. Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nichole Forrest, filed. (Ponig, Christina)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Preble-Rish Haiti S.A. / Keith B. Letourneau, Esq. for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 7/23/21 before Judge Ellison. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Nichole Forrest, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATEMENT on Update to Court by BB Energy USA, LLC, filed.(Ponig, Christina)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 7/23/2021. #18 Emergency Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction is taken under advisement. Garnishee is directed to provide an update to the Court regarding whether it claims an interest in the property at issue no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday 7/26/2021. Appearances: William R. Bennett, III, Lauren B. Wilgus, Keith Bernard Letourneau.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest)(Law clerk: A. Mody), filed.(arrivera, 4)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery from Garnishee by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Keith)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, , filed by BB Energy USA, LLC. (Ponig, Christina)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney William R. Bennett, III as to Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. re: #14 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (ckrus, 4)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Letourneau, Keith)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Setting as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2021 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STAYING WRIT AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ; Motion-related deadline set re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, Responses due by 7/13/2021. Replies due by 7/16/2021(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN of Service Executed as to BB Energy USA LLC on 7/1/2021 re: Rule B Writ of Attachment, filed.(sguevara, 4)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Order, #1 Complaint, by BB Energy USA, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ponig, Christina)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to BB Energy USA LLC - garnishee on 7/1/21 re: Writ of Maritime Attachment, Order for Writ of Attachment, Original Verified Complaint, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Lauren B. Wilgus to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for William R. Bennett III to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, Republic of Haiti. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Bureau De Montisation De Programmes Daide Au Dveloppement)(jdav, 4)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Lauren B. Wilgus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2021. (Letourneau, Keith)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for William B. Bennett III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2021. (Letourneau, Keith)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Cain on behalf of Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed. (Cain, Zachary)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Republic of Haiti, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Not Issued as to Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, Republic of Haiti Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies One summon per deft needed by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, Republic of Haiti, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Writ of Garnishment Issued, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment and Appointing Process Server. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment and Appointing Process Server re: #1 Complaint,, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support of Request for Issuance of Order Directing Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment re: #1 Complaint, by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement, Republic of Haiti (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26599789) filed by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhs A-WW to Exhibit 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Letourneau, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. v. Republic of Haiti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.
Represented By: Keith Bernard Letourneau
Represented By: Lauren B. Wilgus
Represented By: William R. Bennett, III
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic of Haiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau De Monetisation De Programmes D'Aide Au Developpement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: BB Energy USA, LLC
Represented By: Christina Elise Ponig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?