Valero Energy, LTD. v. Clyde Bergemann US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valero Energy, LTD.
Defendant: Clyde Bergemann US, Inc. and Clyde Bergemann Power Group Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02034
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED JUDGMENT #4 . (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for to Amend Judgment by Valero Energy, LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Amended Judgment Order)(Machisak, Thomas)
July 9, 2021 initial conference is terminated. (arrivera, 4)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of Valero Energy, Ltd. and against lyde Bergemann US, Inc. and Clyde Bergemann Power Group Americas, Inc.. Case terminated on 7/8/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 Valero Energy, LTD.'s Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 49 receipt number 0541-26629015.) filed by Valero Energy, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Order Grant)(Burns, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valero Energy, LTD. v. Clyde Bergemann US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valero Energy, LTD.
Represented By: David Burns
Represented By: Thomas John Machisak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Bergemann US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Bergemann Power Group Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?