Roberts v. A.H.D. Houston, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grace Roberts
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds, Thomas Venza, Christopher Alan Malusa, Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Houston Kurt, A.H.D. Houston, Inc. doing business as Centerfolds Houston, Kurt Houston and Kurt Ramirez
Case Number: 4:2021cv02101
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: David Hittner
2 Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 1/10/2023 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
December 28, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Settlement by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed. (King, William)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Amended SCHEDULING and Docket Control ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2022. Discovery due by 12/16/2022. Mediation due by 1/27/2023. Dispositive and Non- Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/6/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan Jury Trial set for 5/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
October 25, 2022 Filing 60 [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
October 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. MOTION HEARING held on 10/4/2022. The Court heard argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment. Proposed scheduling order due 21 days. Appearances: William Xander King, Casey T Wallace, William Marshall Hogg, Cody Pyke.(ERO:Yes), filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting #58 Opposed MOTION for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 5, 2022 Filing 58 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re: #32 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, William)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Grace Roberts, Thomas Venza and ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 22, 2022 Filing 56 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. Parties to advise court w/in 20 days if they will consent to Judge Bryan. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 6, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Sim Lake. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
July 5, 2022 Filing 53 REPLY in Support of #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Employer Status, filed by Ali Davari, Hassan Davari. (King, William)
July 5, 2022 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #32 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , filed by Grace Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Affidavit)(Hogg, William)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that the Parties' respective reply briefs in support of their competing summary judgment motions shall be due on July 5, 2022.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
June 24, 2022 Filing 49 Joint Request to Extend Deadlines to Submit Reply Briefs in Support of Summary Judgment Motions by Grace Roberts, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hogg, William)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
June 20, 2022 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #32 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - Roberts Depo, #2 Exhibit A2 - Roberts 2019 LAA, #3 Exhibit A3 - Roberts RFA Responses, #4 Exhibit A4 - Roberts INT Responses, #5 Exhibit A5 - Roberts LinkedIn Resume, #6 Exhibit B1 - Gomez Depo, #7 Exhibit B2- Gomez 2020 LAA, #8 Exhibit B3 - Gomez 2021 LAA, #9 Exhibit B4 - Gomez INT Responses, #10 Exhibit B5 - Gomez RFA Responses, #11 Exhibit C1 - 30(b)(6) Witness Depo, #12 Exhibit C2 - AHD's INT Responses, #13 Proposed Order)(King, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 46 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 45 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 44 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 43 Other EXHIBITS re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 42 Other EXHIBITS re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion by Grace Roberts, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 41 DECLARATION of William M. Hogg re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(Hogg, William)
June 20, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #33 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Employer Status, filed by Grace Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summary of Plaintiffs' Response)(Hogg, William)
June 17, 2022 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(King, William)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Joint Motion Request to Continue Abatement of Briefing on Summary Judgment Motions.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 13, 2022 Filing 37 Joint MOTION Abatement of Briefing on Summary Judgment Motions by Grace Roberts, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hogg, William)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Abate Briefing on Summary Judgment Motions. If the parties have not reached a settlement 22 days following this Order, the response deadline for the respective motions for summary judgment will be due 14 days from the end of the abatement period, and any reply brief would be due 7 days after the response is filed..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 14, 2022 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Abate by Grace Roberts, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hogg, William)
April 13, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Hogg on behalf of Grace Roberts, filed. (Hogg, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Employer Status by Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - Gomez Dep, #2 Exhibit A2 - Gomez INT [A. Davari], #3 Exhibit A3 - Gomez INT [H. Davari], #4 Exhibit A4 - Gomez RFA [A. Davari], #5 Exhibit A5 - Gomez RFA [H. Davari], #6 Exhibit B1- Roberts Dep, #7 Exhibit B2 - Roberts INT [A. Davari], #8 Exhibit B3 - Roberts INT [H. Davari], #9 Exhibit B4 - Roberts RFA [A. Davari], #10 Exhibit B5 - Roberts RFA [H. Davari], #11 Proposed Order)(King, William)
March 31, 2022 Filing 32 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Grace Roberts, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Deposition transcript, #5 Exhibit Exhibit, #6 Exhibit declaration, #7 Proposed Order proposed order)(Mason, Jerry)
March 31, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Wallace & Allen, LLP, counsel for A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed. (Wallace, Casey)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Adam Goldsmith terminated. David W. Hodges will remain as Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
December 22, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Michael Goldsmith to Withdraw as Attorney by Grace Roberts, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodges, David)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Grace Roberts, filed.(Mason, Jerry)
November 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry W. Mason on behalf of Grace Roberts, filed. (Mason, Jerry)
November 5, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed.(Wallace, Casey)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is granted as to causes of action arising before June 28, 2018 and as to Robert's claims for overtime wages. The motion is denied as to the factual sufficiency of the allegations establishing FLSA coverage and causes of action arising on or after June 28, 2018.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: September/October 2022. ETT: 3 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 12/31/2021. Discovery due by 2/25/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/31/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/31/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/9/2021. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: William Xander King, Michael Adam Goldsmith.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 SURREPLY opposing Defendant's #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Grace Roberts. (ealexander, 4)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File A Sur-reply opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Grace Roberts, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Goldsmith, Michael)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Grace Roberts, filed.(Goldsmith, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed.(King, William)
August 23, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. , filed by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza. (King, William)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. filed by Grace Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hodges, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by A.H.D. Houston, Inc., Ali Davari, Hassan Davari, Christopher Alan Malusa, Kurt Ramirez, Thomas Venza, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(King, William)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kurt Ramirez served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021, filed.(Hodges, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Christopher Alan Malusa served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021, filed.(Hodges, David)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kurt Ramirez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kurt Ramirez, filed.(Hodges, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Grace Roberts.(Hodges, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas Venza served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021, filed.(Hodges, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to A.H.D. Houston, Inc. served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021, filed.(Hodges, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Wage Claim by Grace Roberts, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Goldsmith, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request Ali Davari, #2 Summons Request Christopher Malusa, #3 Summons Request Hassan Davari, #4 Summons Request Kurt Houston, #5 Summons Request Thomas Venza)(Hodges, David)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grace Roberts, filed.(Goldsmith, Michael)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26657569) filed by Grace Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldsmith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. A.H.D. Houston, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. d/b/a Centerfolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Venza
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Alan Malusa
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Davari
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassan Davari
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Kurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H.D. Houston, Inc. doing business as Centerfolds Houston
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Ramirez
Represented By: William Xander King
Represented By: Casey T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Roberts
Represented By: Michael Adam Goldsmith
Represented By: David Wayne Hodges
Represented By: Jerry Wayne Mason
Represented By: William Marshall Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?