Barber v. BW Offshore USA Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Barber
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, BW Offshore USA Management, Inc. and BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv02106
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 24 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA filed by John Barber.(gclair, 4)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 13, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by John Barber, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint with Jury by BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC, filed. (Reinkemeyer, Megan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Petition on Behalf of BW Offshore USA, LLC by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Answer)(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Against it in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrick, James)
August 9, 2021 *** 8/10 Motion hearing is cancelled., filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Second AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by John Barber.(olindor, 4)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by John Barber, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Skrabanek, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Zoe Vermeulen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Barber, filed.(Skrabanek, Matthew)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed.(Barrick, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Zoe Vermeulen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2021. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Barrick, James)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN REMOVED ACTION by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc., filed.(Reinkemeyer, Megan)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26658553) filed by BW Offshore USA Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Matters Being Filed, #3 List of Parties and Counsel, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Reinkemeyer, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. BW Offshore USA Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA
Represented By: Amanda Goldstein
Represented By: James Stephen Barrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW Offshore USA Management, Inc.
Represented By: Megan LeBato Reinkemeyer
Represented By: Zoe W Vermeulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW OFFSHORE USA, LLC
Represented By: Megan LeBato Reinkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barber
Represented By: Matthew Paul Skrabanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?