City of Warwick Retirement System v. Concho Resources Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Warwick Retirement System
Defendant: Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, Timothy A. Leach, Jack F. Harper, C. William Giraud, Brenda R. Schroer and E. Joseph Wright
Petitioner: Utah Retirement Systems and Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern California
Case Number: 4:2021cv02473
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff( Motion Docket Date 10/19/2021.), MOTION for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by Utah Retirement Systems, Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern California, filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis P. McConville, #2 Exhibit A - Certifications, #3 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #4 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Notice, #6 Exhibit E - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #7 Proposed Order)(McConville, Francis)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Francis P. McConville to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Warwick Retirement System, filed.(McConville, Francis)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Lucisano on behalf of Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Lucisano, Anthony)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Furlow-Malpass on behalf of Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Furlow, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Frank Mace on behalf of Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Mace, Charles)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Hefley on behalf of Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Hefley, Amy)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Sterling on behalf of Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Sterling, David)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Francis P. McConville to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Warwick Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2021. (McConville, Francis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright, filed. (Attachments: #1 ConocoPhillips, #2 Timothy A. Leach, #3 Jack F. Harper, #4 C. William Giraud, #5 Brenda A. Schroer, #6 E. Joseph Wright)(McConville, Francis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concho Resources Inc., ConocoPhillips, C. William Giraud, Jack F. Harper, Timothy A. Leach, Brenda R. Schroer, E. Joseph Wright (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26825573) filed by City of Warwick Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McConville, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Warwick Retirement System v. Concho Resources Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warwick Retirement System
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concho Resources Inc.
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Leach
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack F. Harper
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. William Giraud
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda R. Schroer
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Joseph Wright
Represented By: David D Sterling
Represented By: Amy Pharr Hefley
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lucisano
Represented By: Charles Frank Mace
Represented By: Elizabeth Pennington Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Utah Retirement Systems
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern California
Represented By: Francis P McConville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?