Raney v. JSC Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Wilford Raney
Defendant: JSC Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2021cv02493
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Shamis on behalf of Wilford Raney, filed. (Shamis, Andrew)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JSC Federal Credit Union, filed.(Neerman, Jonathan)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st District Court Harris County, case number 2021-36515 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26835474) filed by JSC Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neerman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raney v. JSC Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Raney
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Angelica Marie Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSC Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Jonathan D Neerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?