Body Brother, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Body Brother, Inc.
Defendant: Yu ZHOU and Hang YU
3Rd Party Defendant: Liu Yang and Rongyan LU
Case Number: 4:2021cv02559
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed.(Yuen, Xenos)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Body Brother, Inc., filed.(Arbuckle, Kurt)
August 10, 2021 Docketed in Error. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0541-26874189, filed. (knguyen, 4)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hlerma, 4)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docketed in Error - ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 07:41 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4) Modified on 8/10/2021 (hlerma, 4).
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Docketed in Error. CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (hlerma, 4) Modified on 8/24/2021 (knguyen, 4).
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 211, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 212, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 213, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 214, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 215, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 216, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 217, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 218, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 219, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 220, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 221, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 222, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 223, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 224, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 225)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 191, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 192, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 193, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 194, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 195, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 196, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 197, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 198, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 199, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 200, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 201, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 202, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 203, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 204, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 205, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 206, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 207, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 209, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 210, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 208)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 171, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 172, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 173, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 174, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 175, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 176, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 177, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 178, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 179, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 180, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 181, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 182, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 183, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 184, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 185, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 186, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 187, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 188, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 189, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 190)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 151, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 152, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 153, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 154, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 155, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 156, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 157, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 158, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 159, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 160, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 161, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 162, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 163, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 164, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 165, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 166, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 167, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 168, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 169, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 170)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 131, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 132, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 133, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 134, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 135, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 136, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 137, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 138, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 139, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 140, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 141, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 142, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 143, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 144, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 145, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 146, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 147, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 148, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 149, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 150)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 111, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 112, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 113, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 114, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 115, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 116, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 117, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 118, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 119, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 120, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 121, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 122, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 123, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 124, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 125, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 126, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 127, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 128, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 129, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 130)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 91, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 92, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 93, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 94, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 95, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 96, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 97, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 98, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 99, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 100, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 101, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 102, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 103, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 104, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 105, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 106, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 107, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 108, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 109, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 110)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 76, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 77, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 78, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 79, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 80, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 81, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 82, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 83, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 84, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 85, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 86, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 87, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 88, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 89, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 90)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to motion to quash motion to compel, #2 Exhibit Proposed partial summary judgment, #3 Exhibit D HY and YZ MSJ, #4 Exhibit Proposed order to quash 2d notice of depo of liu yang, #5 Exhibit Notice of submission of LY's 2d motion to quash, #6 Exhibit LY's second motion to quash final, #7 Exhibit Notice of submission - rl's 2d motion to quash, #8 Exhibit Proposed order RL's 2d motion to quash, #9 Exhibit RL's second motion to quash - final, #10 Exhibit Notice of submission - motion to compel, #11 Exhibit Notice of hearing on msj, #12 Exhibit proposed order denying the motion to reconsider, #13 Exhibit Ps response to motion to reconsider, #14 Exhibit order signed denying reconsideration, #15 Exhibit proposed order denying HY and YZ motion to compel, #16 Exhibit response of YL and RL to motion to compel, #17 Exhibit Ds Reply to response to Ds motion to compel, #18 Exhibit Proposed order on Defendants Motion to Permit Interlocutory Appeal, #19 Exhibit D's Motion to permit interlocutory appeal, #20 Exhibit Order signed denying deposition appearance)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Other EXHIBITS by Hang YU, Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P's Alternate Motion for Continuance of Hearing on D's Motion to Show Authority, #2 Exhibit Notice of Submission of P's Alternate Motion for Continuance, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order recognizing authority, #4 Exhibit Ds Response and Objection to Ps submission of Evidence For Ds Motion to Show Authority, #5 Exhibit THIRD-PARTY COUNTER-PLAINTIFF Rong Yan Lu's Counterclaim to Yu Zhou, #6 Exhibit P's Certificate of Written Discovery, #7 Exhibit P's SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO Ds MOTION TO SHOW AUTHORITY, #8 Exhibit D's Response to P's Motion for Continuance, #9 Exhibit Ds Response and Objection to Ps submission of Evidence For Ds Motion to Show Authority, #10 Exhibit Order Signed Recognizing Authority, #11 Exhibit Proposed Order - quash deposition of liu yang, #12 Exhibit P Liu Yang's Notice of Submission for Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition and for Protective Order, #13 Exhibit P Liu Yang's MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, #14 Exhibit P Liu Yang's Proposed Order for P's Motion to quash deposition of Liu Yang, #15 Exhibit P Liu Yang's Notice of Submission for Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, #16 Exhibit D's Motion to reconsider show authority, #17 Exhibit D's Motion to reconsider show authority Proposed Order, #18 Exhibit notice of submission - motion to quash RL, #19 Exhibit RL's motion to quash deposition final, #20 Exhibit proposed order - D's motion to compel)(Yuen, Xenos)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Supplemental EXHIBITS by Yu ZHOU, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 35)(Hamilton, Byron)
August 6, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0541-26862359, filed. (knguyen, 4)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st District Court of Harris County, case number 2020-43015 ( Filing fee $ 402) filed by Yu ZHOU, Hang YU. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit P's Original Petition Application for TR and TI, #3 Exhibit P's Proposed TRO and Asset Freez, #4 Exhibit P's Letter to D Reg TRO Hearing, #5 Exhibit TRO Order_Sgined by Judge_TIO Hearing on 7-31-2020 1.30 pm, #6 Exhibit P's Letter Posting 5000.00 Bond, #7 Exhibit D's Verified answer, motion to strike hearsay, and motion to show cause, #8 Exhibit D's Motion to Show Authority, #9 Exhibit D's Notice of Hearing on D's Motion to show authority on 08-10-2020 at 2.30 pm, #10 Exhibit Proposed Order on D's Motion to show authority, #11 Exhibit D's Motion for Emergency Hearing Setting, #12 Exhibit D's Motion to Increase Bond, #13 Exhibit D's Notice of Hearing on D's Motion to Increase Bond, #14 Exhibit Cash Receipt for P's Bond 5000.00, #15 Exhibit Order denying motion to increase bond, #16 Exhibit P's Response to D's Motion for Emergency and Motion to Increase Bond, #17 Exhibit PS MOTION IN LIMINE & OBJECTIONS TO PS OFFER [OF] EVIDENCE FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING, #18 Exhibit P's proposed order, #19 Exhibit P's Proposed Order on Temp Injunction, #20 Exhibit Order signed denying Temp Injunction)(Yuen, Xenos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Body Brother, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Body Brother, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu ZHOU
Represented By: Xenos Man-Wah Yuen
Represented By: Byron A Hamilton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hang YU
Represented By: Xenos Man-Wah Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Liu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rongyan LU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?