Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC v. Rieck et al
Plaintiff: Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC
Defendant: Kay Rieck, Lars Degenhardt, Theodor Van Stephoudt, David Hryck, Reed Smith LLP, Michael A Nunes, Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., David Elder, Bruce Ganer, Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. and Helena Energy, LLC
Counter Claimant: Thomas E Hord
Case Number: 4:2021cv02698
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition to #57 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC. (Corn, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 88 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Shannon Mader as to All Parties re: #55 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. New address not found., filed. (olindor, 4)
October 12, 2021 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition to #46 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC. (Corn, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Michael Igyarto, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Corn, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition to #53 MOTION to Dismiss (Subject to his Motion to Remand), filed by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC. (Corn, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Filing 83 ANSWER to #54 Answer to State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Kay Rieck's Motion to Dismiss (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Michael David Igyarto to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
October 11, 2021 Filing 80 REPLY in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Lawsuit , filed by Kay Rieck. (Haddock, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition to #51 MOTION to Remand, filed by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC. (Corn, Robert)
October 8, 2021 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Kay Rieck's Motion to Dismiss by Helena Energy, LLC, Kay Rieck, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haddock, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 77 JOINDER in #76 Response in Opposition to Motion, #73 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by David Hryck, Theodor Van Stephoudt. (Reasoner, Barrett)
October 8, 2021 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition to #51 MOTION to Remand, filed by Reed Smith LLP. (Cox, Collin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael A Nunes, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fogler, Murray)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 10/19/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
October 6, 2021 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition to #51 MOTION to Remand, filed by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kryder, George)
October 5, 2021 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Helena Energy LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corn, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Filing 71 Supplemental JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 70 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Dismiss #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Lawsuit filed by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Michael Igyarto, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Igyarto on behalf of Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed. (Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Michael Igyarto to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 66 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kay Rieck served on 9/9/2021, answer due 9/30/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Theodor Van Stephoudt, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reasoner, Barrett)
October 1, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by David Hryck, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Reasoner, Barrett)
October 1, 2021 Filing 63 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal, by Reed Smith LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Collin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 62 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kevin Rosen as to Reed Smith LLP re: #55 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. No current address found. (ShannonHolden, 4)
September 30, 2021 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Corn, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 12/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4)
September 29, 2021 Filing 60 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Shannon Mader as to Reed Smith LLP re: #50 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. No current address found. (ShannonHolden, 4)
September 23, 2021 Filing 58 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Corn, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss by Bruce Ganer, Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2021. (Rothberg, Timothy)
September 23, 2021 Filing 56 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Bruce Ganer, Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc., filed.(Rothberg, Timothy)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 09/20/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 20, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, COUNTERCLAIM against Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC by Thomas E Hord, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, J)
September 20, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss (Subject to his Motion to Remand) by Thomas E Hord, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, J)
September 20, 2021 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Thomas E Hord, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, J)
September 17, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Remand by Thomas E Hord, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hill, J)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Shannon Mader to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Kevin Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 09/23/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 15, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Marcus Hill on behalf of Thomas E Hord, filed. (Hill, J)
September 14, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss ( Motion Docket Date 10/5/2021.), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Helena Energy, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce Webb, #2 Proposed Order to Dismiss Case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), #3 Proposed Order to Dismiss Case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6))(Haddock, William)
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kryder, George)
September 13, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn Cowan on behalf of David Hryck, Theodor Van Stephoudt, filed. (Cowan, Caitlyn)
September 13, 2021 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bruce Ganer, Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rothberg, Timothy)
September 10, 2021 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Helena Energy, LLC, Kay Rieck, filed.(Haddock, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David Hryck, Theodor Van Stephoudt, filed.(Reasoner, Barrett)
September 10, 2021 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Thomas E Hord, filed.(Hill, J)
September 10, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Reed Smith LLP, filed.(Cox, Collin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 10, 2021 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed.(Kryder, George)
September 10, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Shannon Mader to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Smith LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cox, Collin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Kevin Rosen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reed Smith LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of PHV)(Cox, Collin)
September 9, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett Rawicki on behalf of Reed Smith LLP, filed. (Cox, Collin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal by Kay Rieck, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kay Rieck, #2 Proposed Order)(Haddock, William) Modified on 9/8/2021 (jengonzalez, 4).
September 7, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Lawsuit by Kay Rieck, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haddock, William)
September 3, 2021 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Reed Smith LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Collin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Collin J. Cox on behalf of Reed Smith LLP, filed. (Cox, Collin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 28 Texas Secretary of State Certificate of Service on Stone Pigman by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 27 Texas Secretary of State Certificate of Service on Reed Smith by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 26 Texas Secretary of State Certificate of Service on Hryck by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 25 Texas Secretary of State Certificate of Service on Van Stephoud by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION re: Plaintiff and Defendant Michael Nunes' Waiver of Summons and Date for Response to Complaint by Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC, filed.(Corn, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer by Defendants David Hryck and Theodor van Stephoudt shall be filed by 10/01/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 09/14/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ayesha Najam on behalf of David Hryck, Theodor Van Stephoudt, filed. (Najam, Ayesha)
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by David Hryck, Theodor Van Stephoudt, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reasoner, Barrett)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 06/01/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 07/06/2022. Discovery due by 08/23/2022. Mediation due by 11/08/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/22/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/22/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/08/2022. Docket Call set for 01/23/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (%(username)) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Lawsuit by Helena Energy, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haddock, William)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bruce Ganer served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc. served on 8/23/2021, answer due 9/13/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C. served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed.(Kryder, George)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Information in Removed Action by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed.(Kryder, George)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 09/14/2021.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to State Court Petition in this Removed Action by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend)(Kryder, George)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas E Hord served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Theodor Van Stephoudt served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Reed Smith LLP served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lars Degenhardt served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kay Rieck served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Helena Energy, LLC served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to David Hryck served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Corn, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Kryder, Patrick W. Mizell, Matthew W. Moran, and Jordan W. Leu on behalf of Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C., filed. (Kryder, George)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-48592 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26914116) filed by Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit Notice to State Court Clerk)(Kryder, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC v. Rieck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clingman & Hanger Management Associates, LLC
Represented By: Robert M Corn
Represented By: Michael David Igyarto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Rieck
Represented By: William P Haddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lars Degenhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodor Van Stephoudt
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Represented By: Ayesha Najam
Represented By: Caitlyn Grace Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hryck
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Represented By: Ayesha Najam
Represented By: Caitlyn Grace Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Smith LLP
Represented By: Shannon Mader
Represented By: Collin Joe Cox
Represented By: Kevin Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Nunes
Represented By: Murray J Fogler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Pigman Walther Wittmann, L.L.C.
Represented By: George M Kryder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Ganer
Represented By: Timothy A Rothberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Pine Resources International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A Rothberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Energy, LLC
Represented By: William P Haddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Thomas E Hord
Represented By: J Marcus Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?