Whelan v. American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Whelan
Defendant: American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC and Ports America Texas Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02750
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - In accordance with the #9 NOTICE of Voluntary Partial Dismissal this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Ports America Texas, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant American Roll-On-Roll-Off Carrier LLC remain pending...*** Ports America Texas Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Ports America Texas Inc. by Gregory Whelan, filed. (Shelton, Trenton)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Walker, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Gregory Whelan, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Trenton)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC, filed.(Walker, David)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gregory Whelan, filed.(Shelton, Trenton)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC, filed.(Walker, David)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC, filed.(Walker, David)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th District Court of Harris County, case number 2021-41397 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26933382) filed by American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of State Court Documents)(Walker, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whelan v. American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Whelan
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Represented By: Trenton Anderson Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Roll-On Roll-Off Carrier LLC
Represented By: David R Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ports America Texas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?