Homer v. Homer
Plaintiff: Derek Homer
Defendant: Ebele Homer
Case Number: 4:2021cv02789
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO FILE APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. The Court ORDERS Derek to file an application for the award of necessary expenses under 22 U.S.C. 9007(b)(3) by the close of business on October 29, 2021. Ebele may file a response to Dereks application within 21 days of the date on which Derek files his application. Derek may file a reply brief within seven days of the date on which Ebele files her response. No sur-replies or additional briefing may be filed without leave of court. Case terminated on 10/14/2021. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4)
September 10, 2021 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 9/10/2021. The Court held a hearing on Derek Homers motion for expedited enforcement of child custody determination. The Court GRANTED the motion [Dkt. 8] and ORDERED that S.C.H. be promptly returned to Sweden with Derek. The Court reserved its ruling on Dereks requests for attorneys fees and costs. Appearances: Susan Myres, Hugh Scott Brasher, Udo Ezeamama.(Court Reporter: K.Miller), filed.(jguajardo, 4)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 Receipt for Withdrawal of Passport, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Expedited Enforcement of Child Custody Determination..(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 9/9/2021. The Court held a hearing on Derek Homers motion for expedited enforcementof child custody determination. The Court ordered the parties to reconvene at11:00 a.m. on September 10, 2021. Appearances: Susan Myres, Hugh Scott Brasher, Udo Ezeamama.(Court Reporter: K.Miller), filed.(jguajardo, 4)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Udo Ezeamama to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 Exhibit List by Derek Homer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Expedited Enforcement of Child Custody Determination, #2 Exhibit Motion to Allow Supplement, #3 Exhibit 2nd Amd. Unsworn Declaration for Verification, #4 Exhibit Petition for the Return of Child to Petitioner, #5 Exhibit Alternative Petition for Expedited Enforcement of Child Custody Determination, #6 Exhibit Hague Application, #7 Exhibit Child Custody Order (Swedish), #8 Exhibit Child Custody Order (English), #9 Exhibit Interim Order (Swedish), #10 Exhibit Interim Order (English), #11 Exhibit Final Order (Swedish), #12 Exhibit Final Order (English), #13 Exhibit Social Study (Swedish), #14 Exhibit Social Study (English), #15 Exhibit Myres & Associates Fee Summary, #16 Exhibit Myres & Associates Billing Statements, #17 Exhibit Vanessa Karlsson Fees Summary, #18 Exhibit Vanessa Karlsson Billing Statements)(Myres, Susan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 Amended MOTION Unsworn Declaration for Verification of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Enforcement of Child Custody Determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Declaration for Verification)(Myres, Susan)
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing reset for 9/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (JesusGuajardoadi, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Udo Ezeamama to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ebele Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (hlerma, 4)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Expedited Order on Motion for the Enforcement of A Child Custody Determination, filed by Ebele Homer. (hlerma, 4)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION Motion to Allow Supplement (Hearing set for 9/9/2021 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr)The Court ORDERS Ebele Homer to bring Stephen Homer to Courtroom 600 at 515 Rusk Avenue, Houston, Texas 77002 at 11:30 a.m. on September 9, 2021(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION Unsworn Declaration for Verification of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Enforcement of Child Custody Determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Unsworn Declaration for Verification)(Myres, Susan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION Expedited enforcement of child custody determination filed by Ebele Homer. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Expedited Order on Motion for the Enforcement of A Child Custody Determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Myres, Susan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION Motion to Allow Supplement by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Myres, Susan)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Expedited Response. Responses is due on or before 9/7/2021.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Expedited Order on Motion for the Enforcement of A Child Custody Determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Myres, Susan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 Entry of Order re: Order to Appear by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Myres, Susan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION Expedited enforcement of child custody determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Child Custody Order (English Translation), #2 Exhibit Child Custody Order (Swedish))(Myres, Susan)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Striking Document re: #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Derek Homer. The motion does not comply with the Courts Procedures section 6(C)(2), which requires a certificate of conference for all motions; section 6(C)(3), which requires a separate proposed order; and attorney signature is missing. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION Expedited enforcement of child custody determination by Derek Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Child Custody Order (English Translation), #2 Exhibit Child Custody Order (Swedish))(Myres, Susan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. MOTION HEARING held on 8/27/2021. At the hearing, the following rulings were made as stated on the record:The Court held a motion hearing as stated on the record. The Court took Ebele Homers emergency motion for a stay of the state courts order [Dkt. 2] under advisement. Appearances:Udo Ezeamama. Susan Myres.(Court Reporter: Malone), filed.(jguajardo, 4)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Passport Turnover to The United States District Clerk's Office, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Emergency. Ebele Homer is ORDERED to surrender all passports, irrespective of their country of origin, for Stephen Chidera Homer to the United States Marshals Office on the Tenth Floor of the United States Courthouse at 515 Rusk, Houston, Texas 77002 by 4:00 p.m. on August 27, 2021.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION For Stay of State Court Order Made After Removal of Case to Federal Court by Ebele Homer, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(gclair, 4)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 309th Judicial Court of Harris County, case number 2021-47951 ( Filing fee $ 402) filed by Ebele Homer. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gkelner, 4)
August 25, 2021 Initial Filing fee: $402, receipt number HOU104145, filed. (gkelner, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homer v. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Homer
Represented By: Susan Myres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebele Homer
Represented By: Hugh Scott Brasher
Represented By: Udo Ezeamama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?