Genan, Inc. v. Pescador Partners, Ltd
Plaintiff: Genan, Inc.
Defendant: Pescador Partners, Ltd
Case Number: 4:2021cv03583
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) by Pescador Partners, Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Owens, Randall)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Plead In Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Pescador Partners, Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Owens, Randall)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Genan, Inc., filed.(Kelly, Patrick)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pescador Partners, Ltd. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RachelSalazar, 4)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Pescador Partners, Ltd, filed.(Schiff, John)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pescador Partners, Ltd (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27278645) filed by Genan, Inc..(Schiff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genan, Inc. v. Pescador Partners, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genan, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Schiff
Represented By: Patrick Andrew Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pescador Partners, Ltd
Represented By: Randall Carroll Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?