Acevedo v. Hibernia Resources III, LLC
Plaintiff: Hervey Acevedo
Defendant: Hibernia Resources III, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv03691
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Referring Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred H Bennett. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Cynthia Pickett, N. Kimberly Hoesl, Ana E. Kadala on behalf of Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed. (Pickett, Kathleen)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION re: Collective Action Certification by Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Stuhldreher on behalf of Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed. (Stuhldreher, Peter)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 10:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed.(Temple, Mark)
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed.(Temple, Mark)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hibernia Resources III, LLC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ShannonHoldenadi, 4)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hibernia Resources III, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hibernia Resources III, LLC, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hervey Acevedo, filed.(Miltenberger, Chris)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hibernia Resources III, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27328059) filed by Hervey Acevedo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Miltenberger, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo v. Hibernia Resources III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hervey Acevedo
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibernia Resources III, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Temple
Represented By: Kathleen Cynthia Pickett
Represented By: Peter Justin Stuhldreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?