Guardino v. Hart et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Guardino
Defendant: Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, WKHB LLC, Williams Kherkher LLC, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC and Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP
Case Number: 4:2021cv03721
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #40 Notice of Appeal to George Shepherd III. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-20278), filed.(DorinaReyna, 1)
June 23, 2022 Filing 43 Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: #40 Notice of Appeal. The electronic record on CD is being sent to Kristin Guardino via regular mail. (USCA No. 22-20278), filed. (DorinaReyna, 1)
June 23, 2022 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #40 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 22-20278, filed.(DorinaReyna, 1)
June 21, 2022 Filing 42 DKT13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER REQUEST by Kristin Guardino. No hearings This order form relates to the following: #40 Notice of Appeal, filed. (jdav, 4)
June 14, 2022 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 22-20278 re: #40 Notice of Appeal, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 9, 2022 Filing 41 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #40 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): H. Alcaraz, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jtabares, 1)
June 9, 2022 Appeal Review Notes re: #40 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. The appeal filing fee has been paid or an ifp motion has been granted. Pending the upload of exhibits for Dkt #22.Hearings were held in the case. DKT13 transcript order form(s) due within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(jtabares, 1)
June 8, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #39 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Kristin Guardino, filed.(ckrus, 4)
June 8, 2022 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505, receipt number HOU109436 re: #40 Notice of Appeal, filed.(ckrus, 4)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim. This is a Final Judgment. Case terminated on May 12, 2022.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 9, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, Williams Kherkher LLC, Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP. (Shepherd, George)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File to Extend the Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and to Re-File Plaintiff's Response.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
March 1, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION for Leave to File to Extend the time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and to Re-File Plaintiff's Response and Briefi n Support of Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Support of Pla , filed by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, Williams Kherkher LLC, Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shepherd, George)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Main Document 35 replaced on 3/1/2022) (ealexander, 4). ORDER denying #29 Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Main Document 35 replaced on 3/1/2022) (ealexander, 4).
February 25, 2022 Filing 34 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to #29 MOTION to Strike, filed by Kristin Guardino. (olindor, 4)
February 23, 2022 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Kristin Guardino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 23, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File to Extend the time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and to Re-File Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. by Kristin Guardino, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2022. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 23, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #29 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shepherd, George)
February 22, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Kristin Guardino. (jtabares, 1)
February 22, 2022 Filing 29 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. by Kristin Guardino, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #26 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 15, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, Williams Kherkher LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shepherd, George)
February 15, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Kristin Guardino, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(dnoriega, 1)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Striking Document re: #21 Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 18), Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Kristin Guardino Exceeds the page limit.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 EXHIBIT - USB Flash Drive of Exhibit B in Clerk's Office re: #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Kristin Guardino. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: January/February 2023. ETT: 2 weeks. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 3/31/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 4/29/2022. Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/31/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/31/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/30/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
February 4, 2022 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2022. Scheduling order entered. Appearances:Kristin Guardino. George Billy Shepherd, III.(Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
January 20, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 09:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
January 18, 2022 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed.(Shepherd, George)
January 18, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Shepherd, George)
January 18, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kristin Guardino, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 28, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Kristin Guardino, J.D. re: erroneously omitted waiver of service returns, filed. (olindor, 4)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 10:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Williams Kherkher LLC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022, filed.(olindor, 4)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Williams BHE LLC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022, filed.(olindor, 4)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to WKHB LLC served on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/18/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Williams HBE LLC, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP served on 12/2/2021, answer due 1/31/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Eddie Williams, Jr served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sean H McCarthy served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jim Hart served on 11/24/2021, answer due 1/24/2022, filed.(jtabares, 1)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, Williams Kherkher LLC, Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RachelSalazaradi, 4)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (thanniable, 4)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKETED IN ERROR. FOR CORRECTED ENTRY SEE #4 . NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (thanniable, 4)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jim Hart, Sean H McCarthy, WKHB LLC, John Eddie Williams, Jr, Williams BHE LLC, Williams HBE LLC, Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP, Williams Kherkher LLC, Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP filed by Kristin Guardino. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(thanniable, 4)
November 12, 2021 Initial Filing fee: $402.00 re: #1 Complaint,, receipt number HOU105600, filed. (thanniable, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardino v. Hart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Guardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hart
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean H McCarthy
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eddie Williams, Jr
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Kherkher Hart & Boundas LLP
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKHB LLC
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Kherkher LLC
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams BHE LLC
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams HBE LLC
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willliams Hart Boundas Easterby LLP
Represented By: George Billy Shepherd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?