Jordan v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) et al
Plaintiff: Larry Jordan
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) and Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Case Number: 4:2021cv03839
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/8/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/12/2022. Discovery due by 9/30/2022. Mediation due by 9/30/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/15/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2022. Docket Call set for 10/28/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on January 7, 2022. The court will separately enter a scheduling and docket control order, as stated in detail on the record.Appearances:Casey Brown for Pltf. and William Ashcraft for Defts.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(leddins, 4)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ashcraft, William)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ashcraft, William)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), filed.(Ashcraft, William)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 03:00 PM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), filed.(Ashcraft, William)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), filed.(Ashcraft, William)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 361st Brazos County Judicial District Court, case number 21-002805-cv-361 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27381021) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Citation (Processing), #2 Exhibit 1B - Citation (Production), #3 Exhibit 2A - Ptf's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit 2B - Answer (Processing), #5 Exhibit 2C - Answer (Production), #6 Exhibit 3 - Brazos County Case Summary Sheet, #7 Exhibit 4 - Index of All Matters Filed, #8 Exhibit 5 - List of All Counsel of Record, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashcraft, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jordan
Represented By: Michael Stephen Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Represented By: William O Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Represented By: William O Ashcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?