Brown v. Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emma Brown
Defendant: Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., Desroy Martin and Wood Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04093
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed.(DeLuca, Bradley)
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Strike Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(DeLuca, Bradley)
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit Murphy Declaration, #4 Exhibit Mowbray Declaration, #5 Exhibit EPC Agreement, #6 Exhibit HKA AMEC Contract, #7 Proposed Order Order)(DeLuca, Bradley)
January 26, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeLuca, Bradley)
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(DeLuca, Bradley)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Emma Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Proposed Order)(Buzbee, Anthony)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Emma Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Buzbee, Anthony)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Emma Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Buzbee, Anthony)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Defendants Certificate of Interested Parties and List of All Counsel of Record by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed.(DeLuca, Bradley)
January 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 04/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 03/25/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 10/25/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 11/29/2022. Discovery due by 01/13/2023. Mediation due by 03/31/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/14/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 02/14/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 05/02/2023. Docket Call set for 06/19/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 01/08/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order in Removed Case. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brigid D. Ashcraft on behalf of Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed. (DeLuca, Bradley)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L. DeLuca on behalf of Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed. (DeLuca, Bradley)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service in Removed Action by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed.(DeLuca, Bradley)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Information in Removed Action by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc., filed.(DeLuca, Bradley)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Desroy Martin, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeLuca, Bradley)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st Houston state district court, case number 2021-66296 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27482439) filed by Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(DeLuca, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Brown
Represented By: Anthony G Buzbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amec Foster Wheeler Kamtech, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Lane DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desroy Martin
Represented By: Bradley Lane DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Lane DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?