Lagrone v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jody Lagrone
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, LTD and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2021cv04229
Filed: December 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED ORDER (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 5-8 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2022 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 4/3/2023. Pltf Expert Report due by 4/3/2023. Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/1/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 5/1/2023. Discovery due by 6/16/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/28/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/16/2023. Responses due by 8/18/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen Jury Trial set for 3/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Court conducted the Initial Conference and entered a Scheduling Order. Appearances: Christopher Robert Cowan, Randal Alan Kauffman. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:35-10:36AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
July 8, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cowan, Christopher)
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cowan, Christopher)
July 8, 2022 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cowan, Christopher)
July 8, 2022 Filing 17 Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan under Rule 26(F) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.by Jody Lagrone, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. filed. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cowan, Christopher)
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jody Lagrone, filed.(Kauffman, Randal)
May 12, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
May 2, 2022 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference reset for 8/10/2022 at 10:40 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon (sjones, 4)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Jarreau on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. (Cowan, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc., filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Kauffman, Randal)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Kauffman, Randal)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ; Answer due for Ethicon, Inc. 4/18/2022; Johnson & Johnson 4/18/2022(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Christopher)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Jody Lagrone.(Kauffman, Randal)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time;. Defendants answer deadline is March 18, 2022.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 2, 2022 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 10:50 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon (sjones, 4)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Christopher)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LTD, Johnson & Johnson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BrandisIsom, 4)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
December 31, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jody Lagrone, filed. (Attachments: #1 Draft summons - Ethicon LLC, #2 Draft summons - Ethicon Ltd, #3 Draft Summons - Johnson and Johnson Corp)(Houssiere, Charles)
December 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27542702) filed by Jody Lagrone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Houssiere, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagrone v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Lagrone
Represented By: Randal Alan Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?