Thomas v. Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Wayne Thomas
Defendant: Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00427
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC, filed.(Finck, David)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ; Answer due for Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC 4/8/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnish, James)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wayne Thomas, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 17, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC served on 2/15/2022, answer due 3/8/2022, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RachelWillborg, 4)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Grubb on behalf of Wayne Thomas, filed. (Grubb, John)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC, filed.(Ku, Brian)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27726913) filed by Wayne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ku, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Thomas
Represented By: John K Grubb
Represented By: Brian Tse-Hua Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyerland Retail Associates, LLC
Represented By: David E Finck
Represented By: James T. Barnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?