McKimmy v. OpenSea
Plaintiff: Timothy McKimmy
Defendant: Opensea
Case Number: 4:2022cv00545
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Compel Arbitration.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
July 5, 2022 Filing 27 STATEMENT re: #17 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by OpenSea, filed.(Cole, Rodger)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Y. Monica Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
June 24, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/24/2022. Appearances: Andrew Anh Dao, Eric James Ball, Molly R. Melcher, Anthony Douglas Drumheller.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest), filed.(ledwards, 4)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Continuance; Motion-related deadline set re: #22 Renewed MOTION for Continuance of INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
June 17, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Drumheller on behalf of OpenSea, filed. (Drumheller, Anthony)
June 17, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy T. Monthy on behalf of OpenSea, filed. (Monthy, Jeremy)
June 15, 2022 Filing 22 Renewed MOTION for Continuance of INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2022. (Cole, Rodger)
May 31, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #17 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, filed by OpenSea. (Cole, Rodger)
May 23, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Timothy McKimmy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Dao, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Continuance; Motion-related deadline set re: #16 MOTION for Continuance of INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES. Initial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Y. Monica Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/6/2022. (Cole, Rodger)
May 2, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ian Meader, #2 Affidavit of Molly Melcher, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order)(Cole, Rodger)
April 28, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Continuance of INITIAL PRETRIAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Molly R. Melcher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Cole, Rodger)
March 17, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY-IN-CHARGE by OpenSea, filed. (Cole, Rodger)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Molly R. Melcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Eric Ball to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Rodger R. Cole to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Timothy McKimmy, filed.(Dao, Andrew)
March 9, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by OpenSea, filed.(Miller, Geoffrey)
March 9, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Molly R. Melcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2022. (Miller, Geoffrey)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Eric Ball to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2022. (Miller, Geoffrey)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Rodger R. Cole to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OpenSea, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2022. (Miller, Geoffrey)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey R. Miller on behalf of OpenSea, filed. (Miller, Geoffrey)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to OpenSea served on 3/1/2022, answer due 5/2/2022, filed.(Dao, Andrew)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to OpenSea. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to OpenSea, filed.(Dao, Andrew)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Opensea (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27774517) filed by Timothy McKimmy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dao, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKimmy v. OpenSea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McKimmy
Represented By: Andrew Anh Dao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opensea
Represented By: Eric James Ball
Represented By: Geoffrey Robert Miller
Represented By: Molly R. Melcher
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Represented By: Yukiu Monica Chan
Represented By: Anthony Douglas Drumheller
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Monthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?