ATI Restoration, LLC v. Csernik et al
Plaintiff: ATI Restoration, LLC
Defendant: Frank C. Csernik and Roadrunner Restoration Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00872
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Compel Responses to Expedited Discovery and for Attorneys' Fees( Motion Docket Date 6/2/2022.) by ATI Restoration, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stephen J. Roppolo)(Bezney, Theanna)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. PLEASE NOTE THIS HEARING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM; NOT BY TELEPHONE (rhawkins)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Resetting as to #11 Joint MOTION to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Injunction. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing re-set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins, 4) (rhawkins, 4).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Injunction by ATI Restoration, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2022. (Bezney, Theanna)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction by ATI Restoration, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2022. (Bezney, Theanna)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Injunction Hearing set for 5/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen (rhawkins)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Frank C. Csernik served on 4/6/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Roadrunner Restoration Company, LLC served on 4/6/2022, answer due 6/6/2022, filed.(Roppolo, Stephen)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Bond payment received: $5000.00 re: #7 Temporary Restraining Order,, receipt number HOU108238, filed. (jdav, 4)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction is set for April 18, 2022 at 10:00am, courtroom 9C before the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY IN AID OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION HEARING granting #5 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION to Expedite Discovery. Injunction Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen)(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION, MOTION to Expedite Discovery( Motion Docket Date 4/25/2022.) by ATI Restoration, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bezney, Theanna)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order April 4, 2022 Motion Hearing is terminated. The parties have indicated they agreed to a temporary restraining order. (rhawkins)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed.(Roppolo, Stephen)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Setting as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ATI Restoration, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction)(Roppolo, Stephen)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank C. Csernik, Roadrunner Restoration Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27896901) filed by ATI Restoration, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Roppolo, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATI Restoration, LLC v. Csernik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATI Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J Roppolo
Represented By: Theanna M Bezney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank C. Csernik
Represented By: Andrew T Turner
Represented By: Jeffrey Shannon Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Restoration Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T Turner
Represented By: Jeffrey Shannon Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?