Whitfield v. Paychex Business Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sayfonh Whitfield
Defendant: Paychex Business Solutions, LLC, Group Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for employees of PAYCHEX BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Air Filters, Inc., Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company and Group Supplemental Dependent Life
Case Number: 4:2022cv01453
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Answer due by 7/14/2022 for Air Filters, Inc. and Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan). (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 23, 2022 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Air Filters parties to file a responsive pleading by Sayfonh Whitfield, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphrey, Brian)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Answer due by 7/25/2022 for Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company and Paychex Business Solutions, LLC). (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 22, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Paychex Business Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herring, Danielle)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Answer due by 6/23/2022 for UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.)(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Answer due by 6/23/2022 for Air Filters, Inc. and Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan). (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 2, 2022 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for United HealthCare to File a Responsive Pleading by Sayfonh Whitfield, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphrey, Brian)
June 1, 2022 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Air Filter Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by Sayfonh Whitfield, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphrey, Brian)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022; Air Filters, Inc. served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022; Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/23/2022; Paychex Business Solutions, LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/23/2022; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Executed, #2 Return of Service - Executed, #3 Return of Service - Executed, #4 Return of Service - Executed)(Humphrey, Brian)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Paychex Business Solutions, LLC and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Companys shall have until June 23, 2022, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Original Complaint. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response by Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Paychex Business Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herring, Danielle)
June 1, 2022 The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4)
May 10, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Paychex Business Solutions, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Paychex Business Solutions, LLC, filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan, Air Filters, Inc., Group Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for employees of PAYCHEX BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (BrandisIsom, 4)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Group Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for employees of PAYCHEX BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Air Filters, Inc., filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan, filed.(Humphrey, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan, Air Filters, Inc., Group Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for employees of PAYCHEX BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company, Paychex Business Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28135292) filed by Sayfonh Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Humphrey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. Paychex Business Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayfonh Whitfield
Represented By: Brian Scott Humphrey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex Business Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for employees of PAYCHEX BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Filters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Filters Health and Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Supplemental Dependent Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?