Marco Specialty Steel, Inc v. Western Surety Co.
Plaintiff: Marco Specialty Steel, Inc.
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv02550
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Referring Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay . This case is stayed and administratively closed. The parties may move to reinstate the case on this Court's active docket at an appropriate time in the furture. Case terminated on 08/26/2022.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Aaron Matthew Guerrero and Bryan Nathaniel Prentice in place of Ben Kadden and Jackson M. Smith. Attorney Bryan Nathaniel Prentice for Marco Specialty Steel, Inc. added. Attorney Benjamin Warren Kadden and Jackson McLaurin Smith terminated.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 22, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Western Surety Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laney, Bradford)
August 19, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Aaron Matthew Guerrero and Bryan Nathaniel Prentice in place of Ben Kadden and Jackson M. Smith by Marco Specialty Steel, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guerrero, Aaron)
August 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Eskridge. Parties notified, filed. (gclair, 4)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE granting #15 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Charles Eskridge. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Eskridge for all further proceedings. Judge Alfred H Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Charles Eskridge by Western Surety Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laney, Bradford)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett( Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
August 1, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:22-cv-01465; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #11 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be transferred to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/01/2022.(am)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Transfer Case and Open New Case by Western Surety Company and Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dawson, Tanya) Modified text on 8/1/2022 (am).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Western Surety Company answer due 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 07/13/2022. (am)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dawson, Tanya)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Western Surety Company answer due 7/13/2022. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 06/22/2022. (am)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. **Please, disregard the previously issued deficiency. The document is not deemed deficient. **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. **2. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **3. **Document lists counsel Bradford T. Laney, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (am)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Tanya Dugas Dawson added to party Western Surety Company(pty:dft).(Dawson, Tanya) Modified text/removed referral/removed submission on 6/22/2022 (am).
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Western Surety Company served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Kadden, Benjamin)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Western Surety Co. (ko)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Western Surety Co. filed by Marco Specialty Steel, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Kadden, Benjamin) Modified on 5/27/2022 (ko).
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Western Surety Co. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9371235) filed by Marco Specialty Steel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - January 19, 2022 Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Benjamin Warren Kadden added to party Marco Specialty Steel, Inc.(pty:pla).(Kadden, Benjamin) Modified on 5/27/2022 (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marco Specialty Steel, Inc v. Western Surety Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Specialty Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Warren Kadden
Represented By: Jackson McLaurin Smith
Represented By: Aaron Matthew Guerrero
Represented By: Bryan Nathaniel Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Tanya Dugas Dawson
Represented By: Bradford Turner Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?