WesternGeco L.L.C. v. Magseis FF LLC
Plaintiff: WesternGeco L.L.C.
Defendant: Magseis FF LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03080
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by WesternGeco L.L.C., filed.(Nye, James)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Magseis FF LLC, filed.(Ourso, Candace)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 458th District Court, Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 22-DCV-295787 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28749931) filed by Magseis FF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit List of All Counsel of Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ourso, Candace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WesternGeco L.L.C. v. Magseis FF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WesternGeco L.L.C.
Represented By: Callie E Murphy
Represented By: James Hunter Nye
Represented By: Charles Douglas Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magseis FF LLC
Represented By: Candace A. Ourso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?