Chevron Products Company et al v. Trafigura Trading LLC
Plaintiff: Chevron Products Company and Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Trafigura Trading LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv03729
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #24 Agreed MOTION to Amend #21 Scheduling Order, Deft Expert Report due by 9/3/2024., Fact Discovery due by 6/3/2024., Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2024, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/1/2024., Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2025., Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/31/2024., Pltf Expert Report due by 7/15/2024., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Andrew S Hanen, Jury Trial set for 3/17/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Andrew S Hanen)(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JoanDavenport, 4)
October 30, 2023 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION to Amend #21 Scheduling Order,, by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Fields)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #18 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Confidentiality Order (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED E-DISCOVERY ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: E-Discovery (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 7 days. Bench. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2023 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 3/15/2024. Pltf Expert Report due by 3/15/2024. Deft Expert Witness List due by 5/1/2024. Deft Expert Report due by 5/1/2024. Discovery due by 2/2/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/2/2024. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/1/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen Jury Trial set for 3/17/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Court conducted the Initial Conference and entered a Scheduling Order. Appearances: Madison Fay Young, Seepan Vartan Parseghian, John B Strasburger, Jason Edward Williams, Erin Marie Lucas Bullard. Ct Reporter: ERO. Digital Number: 10:00-10:03AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) Modified on 4/20/2023 (sjones, 4).
April 19, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: E-Discovery by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed E-Discovery Order)(Alexander, Fields)
April 19, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Confidentiality Order by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Alexander, Fields)
April 13, 2023 Filing 17 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re: #11 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan, filed.(Strasburger, John)
April 13, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trafigura Trading LLC, filed.(Strasburger, John)
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Marie Lucas Bullard on behalf of Trafigura Trading LLC, filed. (Bullard, Erin)
April 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Williams on behalf of Trafigura Trading LLC, filed. (Williams, Jason)
April 4, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Young on behalf of Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. (Young, Madison)
April 4, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Seepan V. Parseghian on behalf of Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. (Parseghian, Seepan)
April 3, 2023 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Alexander, Fields)
March 15, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trafigura Trading LLC identifying Trafigura Group Pte. Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Strasburger, John)
March 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE to the Court Regarding Service by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. (Alexander, Fields)
March 1, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Trafigura Trading LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Trafigura Trading LLC, filed.(Alexander, Fields)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed.(Alexander, Fields)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (sjones, 4)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting re: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve. Chevron's service deadline is extended to March 31, 2023.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time To Serve by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Serve)(Alexander, Fields)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trafigura Trading LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28990434) filed by Chevron Products Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Fields)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevron Products Company et al v. Trafigura Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron Products Company
Represented By: Fields Alexander
Represented By: Madison Fay Young
Represented By: Seepan Vartan Parseghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Fields Alexander
Represented By: Madison Fay Young
Represented By: Seepan Vartan Parseghian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trafigura Trading LLC
Represented By: John B Strasburger
Represented By: Erin Marie Lucas Bullard
Represented By: Jason Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?