Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Adora Healthcare Services Inc
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Defendant: ADORA HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. and Adora Healthcare Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2022cv03952
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1337 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2022 Filing 7 DOCKETED IN ERROR. CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (dheine, 4) Modified on 11/25/2022 (gclair, 4).
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Adora Healthcare Services Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(TerriHanniable, 4)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Granting #4 Motion for Nathaniel Rayle to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Nathaniel Rayle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2022. (Rayle, Nathaniel)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADORA HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation.(Rayle, Nathaniel)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADORA HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rayle, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Adora Healthcare Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Nathaniel Rayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADORA HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adora Healthcare Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?