Gordon et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tremaine Gordon and Cynthia L Covington
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Thomas Willtrout and Nickelson Goldie
Case Number: 4:2022cv04109
Filed: November 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Service of ProcessMotions referred to Peter Bray. by Cynthia L Covington, Tremaine Gordon, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2)(Ventress, Lisa)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Willtrout, #2 Summons - Nickelson)(Ventress, Lisa)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/16/2023 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/15/2022) (jmarchand, 4).
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 2/21/2023 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2023 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4)
November 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nickelson Goldie, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Thomas Willtrout (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29117207) filed by Tremaine Gordon, Cynthia L Covington.(Ventress, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon et al v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tremaine Gordon
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Ventress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L Covington
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Ventress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Willtrout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickelson Goldie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?