Seventh Coast Ventures LLC v. Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., LTD., et al.
Defendant: Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., Ltd., Sealed Defendants Does 2-46, eniecuangomall, Quanzhou Matson Bag Co. Ltd., Eceen Electronic Limited, Xiamen Daygos Technology Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Eazybags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd., Jin Hua Feima Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Leadwin Bags Co., Ltd., Xiamen Flywon Import & Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Furunst Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd., Xiamen Huaxinlu Industry And Trade Co.,, Quanzhou Gu Yi Supply Chain Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Huajun Sporting Goods Co., Ltd., Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Jolly Jogger Bags Co., Ltd., QUANZHOU JOLLY JOGGER BAGS CO., LTD, Quanzhou Junteng Imp & Exp. Co., Ltd., Huian Maohuang Handbag Clothing Co.,, Xiamen Maple Bags Co.,Ltd, Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Dingyi Import And Export Co., Ltd., Panway Industries Co., Ltd., Fujian Paxdun Import And Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Prideone Business Development Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Yuanxin Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Action Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Doris Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Qiming Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd, Xiamen Relink Imp. And Exp. Co., Ltd., Xiamen Tanso Import & Export Co., Ltd., Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Tengliang Bags Co., Ltd., SJ Outdoor Online Store Store, VOJUD Store, XingLong Store, Qinzily Outdoors Store, AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store, HONGTT Store, umutcan store, SKL Sports Direct, TOTOKA, Shenzhen Ronghuafigui E-commerce Co. Ltd. and REINOS
Counter Defendant: Seventh Coast Ventures LLC
Counter Claimant: Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports
Case Number: 4:2022cv04474
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 75 MOTION for Entry of Default against Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd., Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd., HONGTT Store, Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd., Huian Maohuang Handbag Clothing Co.,, Jin Hua Feima Bag Co., Ltd., Panway Industries Co., Ltd., QUANZHOU JOLLY JOGGER BAGS CO., LTD, Quanzhou Action Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Doris Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Eazybags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Furunst Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Huajun Sporting Goods Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Jolly Jogger Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Junteng Imp & Exp. Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Leadwin Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Prideone Business Development Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Qiming Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd, Quanzhou Tengliang Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Yuanxin Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., SJ Outdoor Online Store Store, Shenzhen Ronghuafigui E-commerce Co. Ltd., TOTOKA, VOJUD Store, Xiamen Maple Bags Co.,Ltd, Xiamen Relink Imp. And Exp. Co., Ltd., Xiamen Tanso Import & Export Co., Ltd., umutcan store by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Layla T. Nguyen in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Defaulting Defendants, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certificates of Service)(Nguyen, Layla)
September 18, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Striking re: #63 MOTION for Entry of Default against AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store, Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd., Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd., HONGTT Store, Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd., Huian Maohuang Handbag Cloth by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Nguyen, Layla)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Unseal.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LisaEdwards, 4)
September 8, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/8/2023. The motion to Unseal is GRANTED. Appearances: Craig Anthony Wirth, Layla T. Nguyen.(Court Reporter: M. Malone), filed.(LisaEdwards, 4)
August 28, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 9/8/2023 at 01:30 PM in by telephone before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (LisaEdwards, 4)
August 17, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2023. (Nguyen, Layla)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to REINOS; Granting #67 Notice of Dismissal (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS, Qinzily Outdoors Store, XingLong Store, AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store and HONGTT Store and WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO SKL Sports Direct(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT NO. 5(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd. terminated, per #68 ORDER(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 7, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Dismissal as to REINOS by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
July 5, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd. by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
June 28, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Dismissal as to AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store, HONGTT Store, Qinzily Outdoors Store, SKL Sports Direct, XingLong Store by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
May 5, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/5/2023. Pending motions under consideration. Appearances: Eliezer Lekht.(Court Reporter: N. Forest), filed.(ledwards, 4)
April 20, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION for Entry of Default against AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store, Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd., Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd., HONGTT Store, Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd., Huian Maohuang Handbag Clothing Co.,, Jin Hua Feima Bag Co., Ltd., Panway Industries Co., Ltd., QUANZHOU JOLLY JOGGER BAGS CO., LTD, Qinzily Outdoors Store, Quanzhou Action Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Doris Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Eazybags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Furunst Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Huajun Sporting Goods Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Jolly Jogger Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Junteng Imp & Exp. Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Leadwin Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Prideone Business Development Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Qiming Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd, Quanzhou Tengliang Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Yuanxin Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., SJ Outdoor Online Store Store, SKL Sports Direct, Shenzhen Ronghuafigui E-commerce Co. Ltd., TOTOKA, VOJUD Store, Xiamen Maple Bags Co.,Ltd, Xiamen Relink Imp. And Exp. Co., Ltd., Xiamen Tanso Import & Export Co., Ltd., XingLong Store, umutcan store by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Layla T. Nguyen, #2 Exhibit 1 - List of Defaulting Defendants)(Nguyen, Layla)
April 20, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Fujian Paxdun Import And Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Dingyi Import And Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Gu Yi Supply Chain Co., Ltd., Xiamen Daygos Technology Co., Ltd., Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., Ltd., Xiamen Flywon Import & Export Co., Ltd., Xiamen Huaxinlu Industry And Trade Co., by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
April 20, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Striking DE 60 by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Nguyen, Layla)
April 20, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for Entry of Default against Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., Ltd., Xiamen Daygos Technology Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Eazybags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd., Jin Hua Feima Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Leadwin Bags Co., Ltd., Xiamen Flywon Import & Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Furunst Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd., Xiamen Huaxinlu Industry And Trade Co.,, Quanzhou Gu Yi Supply Chain Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Huajun Sporting Goods Co., Ltd., Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Jolly Jogger Bags Co., Ltd., QUANZHOU JOLLY JOGGER BAGS CO., LTD, Quanzhou Junteng Imp & Exp. Co., Ltd., Huian Maohuang Handbag Clothing Co.,, Xiamen Maple Bags Co.,Ltd, Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Dingyi Import And Export Co., Ltd., Panway Industries Co., Ltd., Fujian Paxdun Import And Export Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Prideone Business Development Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Yuanxin Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Action Bag Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Doris Outdoor Products Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Qiming Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd, Xiamen Relink Imp. And Exp. Co., Ltd., Xiamen Tanso Import & Export Co., Ltd., Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd., Quanzhou Tengliang Bags Co., Ltd., SJ Outdoor Online Store Store, VOJUD Store, XingLong Store, Qinzily Outdoors Store, AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store, HONGTT Store, umutcan store, SKL Sports Direct, TOTOKA, Shenzhen Ronghuafigui E-commerce Co. Ltd. by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Layla T. Nguyen, #2 Exhibit 1 - List of Defaulting Defendants)(Nguyen, Layla)
April 14, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
April 14, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2023. Counsel failed to appear for the initial conference held April 14, 2023. Appearances:(Court Reporter: M.Malone), filed.(ledwards, 4)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #56 Notice of Dismissal of Eceen Electronic Limited(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 7, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Eceen Electronic Limited by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant # 29 Quanzhou Matson Bag Co., (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
April 5, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Quanzhou Matson Bag Co. Ltd. by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Responses due by 4/11/2023.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER allowing Bernard C. Kwan to appear as counsel of record for Plaintiff Seventh Coast Ventures, LLC (As stated on the record) (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 31, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. INJUNCTION HEARING held on 3/31/2023. Preliminary Injunction Conditionally GRANTED. Counsel to provide proof of service of today's hearing. Appearances: Bernard Chi-Shun Kwan.(Court Reporter: K. Miller), filed.(ledwards, 4)
March 30, 2023 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Motion For Preliminary Injunction re: #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
March 30, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION FOR THE CLERK TO ENTER DEFENDANTS INTO THE CM/ECF SYSTEM by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 28, 2023 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Substitute Party Wei Ling Tech (ShenzhenRonghuafugui E-commerce Co., LTD.) is substituted for Defendant Joybuy Fashion..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 28, 2023 Filing 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 27, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION to Unseal Docket Entry No. 7 by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 24, 2023 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Peter)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting re: #41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Defendant Kuyou Sports' Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction (DE 39). Replies due by 3/29/2023.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
March 17, 2023 Filing 44 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Leave to Substitute re: #43 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Sealed Defendants Does 2-46, filed.(Milam, Chelsea)
March 17, 2023 Filing 43 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Sealed Defendants Does 2-46 by Sealed Defendants Does 2-46, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2023. (Milam, Chelsea)
March 17, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Milam on behalf of Sealed Defendants Does 2-46, filed. (Milam, Chelsea)
March 15, 2023 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to Defendant Kuyou Sports' Brief Opposing Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction (DE 39) by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 14, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant No. 39 Kuyou Outdoors by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2023. (Nguyen, Layla)
March 8, 2023 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Hongyun Wen, #2 Exhibit Registered Trademark for KUYOU, #3 Exhibit Registered Trademark for KUYOU, #4 Exhibit Registered Trademark for KUYOU, #5 Exhibit Registered Trademark for KUYOU, #6 Exhibit Chinese Design Patent, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Haoyi Chen, Ph.D., J.D., #8 Exhibit Amazon.com Screenshots, #9 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Peter)
March 2, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Unseal ECF Nos. 7 & 11 by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
March 2, 2023 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Amended Motion. Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Kuyou Sports.( Injunction Hearing reset for 3/31/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett).(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
February 27, 2023 Filing 35 Corrected AMENDED #31 MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/20/2023.), Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Kuyou Sports, Corrected EMERGENCY MOTION by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Peter)
February 27, 2023 Filing 34 AMENDED #33 MOTION by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
February 23, 2023 Filing 33 MOTION for Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
February 21, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Curtin, Peter)
February 20, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant Kuyou Sports by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Peter)
February 20, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Dismissal as to eniecuangomall by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Entry of Order setting briefing deadline.Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum is due no later than February 28, 2023..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint. Answer due by 3/27/2023.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
February 15, 2023 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Stipulated Briefing Schedule by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Peter)
February 15, 2023 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Layla)
February 15, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Peter J. Curtin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
February 14, 2023 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Peter J. Curtin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/7/2023. (Curtin, Peter)
February 14, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Corsini on behalf of Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports, filed. (Corsini, Craig)
January 30, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
January 25, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed.(Nguyen, Layla)
January 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Injunction Bond by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Injunction Bond)(Nguyen, Layla)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A preliminary injuction hearing is scheduled March 2, 2023 at 1:30 P.M..(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Main Document 18 replaced on 1/12/2023) (ledwards, 4).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Layla T. Nguyen on behalf of Seventh Coast Ventures LLC, filed. (Nguyen, Layla)
January 10, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/10/2023. The Court took up the pending Motion for Alternate Service and TRO. Counsel to submit orders to the court. A hearing on preliminary injunction to be set. Appearances: Joel Benjamin Rothman, Craig Anthony Wirth.(Court Reporter: L. Smith), filed.(ledwards, 4)
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Setting as to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett( Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 27, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:22-cv-01081; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
October 31, 2022 Filing 11 Sealed Summons issued and mailed to attorney Joel Rothman via U.S. first class mail. (jv2)
October 31, 2022 Sealed Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2022: #5 Sealed Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam Chudy) (jv2).
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the designated documents--Schedule A; Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Does 1 to 46); Summonses. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING 9 Ex Parte Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that this motion is MOOT in light of the subsequent motion for the same relief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the designated document and any exhibits. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joel Benjamin Rothman: re #6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process. Your document is titled Ex Parte but is not docketed as a SEALED pleading. The Court requires that thedocuments requesting to be sealed be attached for the Courts review. If it is your intent to have this document sealed,file a Motion to Seal and reference document 6 in your motion and proposed order. Otherwise, this document willremain available to the public. (klw)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Schedule "A" to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 3, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 4, #6 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 5, #7 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Adam Chudy in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Part 6, #8 Summonses, #9 Proposed Order) (Rothman, Joel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman In Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Joel B. Rothman, #3 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Joel)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Joel Benjamin Rothman: re #4 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Your document is titled Ex Parte but is not docketed as a SEALED pleading. The Court requires that the documents requesting to be sealed be attached for the Courts review. If it is your intent to have this document sealed, file a Motion to Seal and reference document 4 in your motion and proposed order. Otherwise, this document will remain available to the public. (klw)
October 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(Rothman, Joel)
October 26, 2022 Notice of Correction: re #5 Deficiency Notice. *** Linked to wrong document - will be reissued as to document #6 Motion. (klw)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (pg)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rothman, Joel)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16676183). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Seventh Coast Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trademark 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trademark 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Claim Chart, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothman, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2022: #6 Sealed Schedule A to Complaint) (jv2).
October 25, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (pg)
October 25, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (pg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seventh Coast Ventures LLC v. Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., LTD., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Seventh Coast Ventures LLC
Represented By: Eliezer Lekht
Represented By: Layla T. Nguyen
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Daysun Industrial Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Defendants Does 2-46
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eniecuangomall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Matson Bag Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eceen Electronic Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Daygos Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Eazybags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Enzo Bags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Hua Feima Bag Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Leadwin Bags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Flywon Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Furunst Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Huaxinlu Industry And Trade Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Gu Yi Supply Chain Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Huajun Sporting Goods Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Jiehan Intelligent Manufacturing Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Jolly Jogger Bags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANZHOU JOLLY JOGGER BAGS CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Junteng Imp & Exp. Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huian Maohuang Handbag Clothing Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Maple Bags Co.,Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huangshan Mesorock Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Dingyi Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panway Industries Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujian Paxdun Import And Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Prideone Business Development Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Yuanxin Outdoor Product Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Action Bag Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Doris Outdoor Products Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Qiming Import & Export Trade Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Relink Imp. And Exp. Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Tanso Import & Export Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujian Quanzhou Tianyi Bags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanzhou Tengliang Bags Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Outdoor Online Store Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOJUD Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XingLong Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qinzily Outdoors Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUBTEC Outdoor Cycling Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONGTT Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: umutcan store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKL Sports Direct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTOKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Ronghuafigui E-commerce Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REINOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shenzhenshi Baocuizhubao Youxiangongsi dba Kuyou Sports
Represented By: Peter James Curtin
Represented By: Craig Alan Corsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?