Baker v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sandra Baker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2023cv00397
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer and/or transcript. Defendant shall have until May 3, 2023, to file her answer and/or certified administrative transcript, or to otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time answer/transcript by Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order granting extension)(Poole, Eric)
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, Social Security Administration (Notice Only), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ShannonHolden, 4)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, Social Security Administration (Notice Only) (Commissioner of SSA served by NEF at the designated email addresses.) filed by Sandra Baker. Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 02/02/2023 by Judge Ellison.(ShannonHolden, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Baker
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Eric Dale Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?