Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. T-Spa MFG., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Defendant: T-SPA MFG., LLC, T-SPA DEPOT, LLC, US NAILS SPA, INC., T-Spa Depot, LLC doing business as T-Spa Salon Furniture and US Nails Spa, Inc. doing business as US Nails & Spa
Case Number: 4:2023cv01173
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(McCoy, Michael)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PATENT SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Join additional parties by 9/1/2023. Preliminary Infringement Contentions due by 9/1/2023. Preliminary Invalidity Contentions and Inequitable Conduct Allegations due 10/2/2023. Exchange Terms and Claims Needing Construction due by 10/23/2023. Exchange Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by 11/20/2023. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by 1/8/2024. Discovery - Claim Construction due by 1/8/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2024. Claim Construction Brief due by 2/2/2024. Claim Construction Response Brief due by 3/4/2024. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 3/11/2024. Markman Hearing set for 3/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on August 17, 2023. The court will separately enter a scheduling and docket control order, as stated in detail on the record. Appearances: James Sakaguchi/Michael McCoy for Pltf. and LaTasha Snipes/Matthew Frontz for Defts.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest), filed.(leddins, 4)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER entered: The allegations as to T-Spa's use of liners appear central to Contego's claims. The motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice as moot; Contego is ordered to file an Amended Complaint no later than September 29, 2023. This order does not preclude T-Spa from filing a motion to challenge the Amended Complaint. The motion to dismiss is denied as moot.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 8/17/2023 at 01:30 PM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be provided. (leddins, 4)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 8/11/2023 at 10:00 AM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be provided. (leddins, 4)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY in Support of #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snipes, LaTasha)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 8/10/2023 at 03:30 PM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be provided. NOTEL Reset is based on time needed to fully brief the motion to dismiss. (leddins, 4)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #29 MOTION for Protective Order (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order by T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2023. (Snipes, LaTasha)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed.(Sakaguchi, James )
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Snipes, LaTasha)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed.(Snipes, LaTasha)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T-Spa Depot, LLC, filed.(Snipes, LaTasha)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed.(McCoy, Michael)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time OPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. The defendants must respond to the complaint by June 30, 2023.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Correspondence)(Snipes, LaTasha)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time OPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(McCoy, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time OPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Opposed Mtn for Ext of Time)(Snipes, LaTasha)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Frontz on behalf of T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. (Snipes, LaTasha)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by LaTasha M. Snipes on behalf of T-Spa Depot, LLC, T-Spa MFG., LLC, filed. (Snipes, LaTasha)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to T-Spa Depot, LLC served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023, filed.(McCoy, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to T-Spa MFG., LLC served on 4/10/2023, answer due 5/1/2023, filed.(McCoy, Michael)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Nails Spa, Inc. served on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023, filed.(McCoy, Michael)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for James Sakaguchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Neal Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for NEAL M. COHEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2023. (McCoy, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for JAMES K. SAKAGUCHI to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2023. (McCoy, Michael)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Q. Amatong, Jr. on behalf of Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed. (Amatong, Alberto)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JacquelineMata, 4)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work (Patent Case). Initial Conference set for 7/14/2023 at 09:30 AM by video before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE Form AO-120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed.(McCoy, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to US NAILS SPA, INC., filed.(McCoy, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to T-SPA DEPOT, LLC, filed.(McCoy, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to T-SPA MFG., LLC, filed.(McCoy, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Contego Spa Designs, Inc., filed.(McCoy, Michael)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29676810) filed by Contego Spa Designs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(McCoy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contego Spa Designs, Inc. v. T-Spa MFG., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven McCoy
Represented By: James K Sakaguchi
Represented By: Neal M Cohen
Represented By: Alberto Quilaneta Amatong, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-SPA MFG., LLC
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Matthew Russell Frontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-SPA DEPOT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US NAILS SPA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Spa Depot, LLC doing business as T-Spa Salon Furniture
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Matthew Russell Frontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Nails Spa, Inc. doing business as US Nails & Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?