GulfMark Americas, Inc. v. Great Eastern Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GulfMark Americas, Inc.
Defendant: Great Eastern Group, Inc.
Garnishee: Military Sealift Command
Case Number: 4:2023cv01783
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Minute Entry for Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray on 7/13/2023. Conference to be continued to August. Appearances: David James. (ERO: D. Berger) (ghassan, 4)
June 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Insert to Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan by GulfMark Americas, Inc., filed. (James, David)
June 20, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Great Eastern Group, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
June 19, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Great Eastern Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Garber, Katherine)
June 12, 2023 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Great Eastern Group, Inc. served on 5/26/2023, answer due 6/16/2023, filed.(Garber, Katherine)
June 2, 2023 Filing 15 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great Eastern Group, Inc. filed by GulfMark Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(James, David)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #7 Second Motion for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment; granting #8 Motion to Vacate the Order Directing Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
June 1, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GulfMark Americas, Inc., filed.(James, David)
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. McClellan on behalf of Military Sealift Command, filed. (McClellan, Jessica)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jessica L McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
May 26, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Great Eastern Group, Inc., GulfMark Americas, Inc., Military Sealift Command, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4)
May 26, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Jessica McClellan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Military Sealift Command, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2023. (Hu, Daniel)
May 26, 2023 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Vacate #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment by Military Sealift Command, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hu, Daniel)
May 25, 2023 Filing 7 Second MOTION Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by GulfMark Americas, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Directing Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment)(James, David)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Great Eastern Group, Inc., Military Sealift Command (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29977890) filed by GulfMark Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(James, David)
May 23, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Great Eastern Group, Inc., Military Sealift Command, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation)(Garber, Katherine)
May 19, 2023 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by GulfMark Americas Inc in the amount of $500.00, receipt number HOU115819 re: #4 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment, filed. (TerriHanniable, 4)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT granting #2 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 10:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by GulfMark Americas, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, David)
May 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great Eastern Group, Inc., Military Sealift Command (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29918872) filed by GulfMark Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GulfMark Americas, Inc. v. Great Eastern Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GulfMark Americas, Inc.
Represented By: David Earl James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Eastern Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Military Sealift Command
Represented By: Jessica L McClellan
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?