Valentine et al v. Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams and Starr Brooks
Defendant: Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC, Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., Suncor Marketing, Inc., Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc., Kevin Fleming and HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC)
Case Number: 4:2023cv02153
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Subject Thereto, Improper Venue, filed by Starr Brooks, Estate of Kurtis R. Williams, Minor D.B, Minor S.L, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
August 2, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Remand filed by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neuer, Raymond)
July 28, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), filed by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Franchise Tax Account Status, #2 Exhibit 2-HPC Website, #3 Exhibit 3-West Virginia Secretary of Stateonline data services, #4 Exhibit 4-Mr. Williamss W2, #5 Exhibit 5-HydroChem LLC v. Evoqua Water Technologies Lawsuit, #6 Exhibit 6-Rosas v. Hydrochem lawsuit, #7 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
July 26, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE/ DISCLOSURES OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., filed.(Martin, William) (Per Attorney) Modified on 7/26/2023 (BrendaLacy, 4).
July 25, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Continuance of CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT HPC INDUSTRIAL SERVICES LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO PERMIT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Franchise Tax Account Status, #2 Exhibit 2-HPC Website, #3 Exhibit 3- West Virginia Secretary of Stateonline data services, #4 Exhibit 4-Williams W2, #5 Exhibit 5-HydroChem lawsuit, #6 Exhibit 6-Hydrochem Lawsuit, #7 Exhibit 7-Jurisdictional Discovery, #8 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
July 25, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Continuance of CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT SUNCOR ENERGY (U.S.A.), INC. (Suncor)'S MOTION TO DISMISS TO PERMIT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT SUNCOR by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Franchise Tax Account Status, #2 Exhibit 2-Jurisdictional Discovery, #3 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
July 25, 2023 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams, filed.(Wexler, Noah)
July 25, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 24, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., filed.(Martin, William)
July 21, 2023 Filing 24 STATEMENT of Information in a Removed Action by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 18, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Subject Thereto, Improper Venue by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandenbout, Justin)
July 17, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 17, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 12, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Franchise Tax Account Status, #2 Exhibit 2-HPC Website, #3 Exhibit 3- West Virginia Secretary of Stateonline data services, #4 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
July 12, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION re: Agreed Dismissal without Prejudice against Defendants Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC, Suncor Energy Marketing, Inc., Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc. and Kevin Fleming by Starr Brooks, Tiffany Valentine, Joyce Williams, filed.(Wexler, Noah)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2023. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/14/2023. Deft Expert Report due by 11/29/2023. Discovery due by 01/03/2024. Mediation due by 01/18/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 02/02/2024. Docket Call set for 03/19/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
July 11, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT to Removal by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 11, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
July 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(3), or in the Alternative, Motion to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed. Motion Docket Date 8/1/2023. (Neuer, Raymond)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order in Removed Case. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC). Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 7, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC), filed.(Wexler, Noah)
July 7, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC) filed by Starr Brooks, Joyce Williams, Tiffany Valentine.(Wexler, Noah)
July 7, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Suncor Marketing, Inc., filed.(Vandenbout, Justin)
July 7, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc., filed.(Vandenbout, Justin)
July 7, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc., filed.(Vandenbout, Justin)
June 29, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kevin Fleming, filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
June 23, 2023 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue ( Motion Docket Date 7/14/2023.) by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, William)
June 23, 2023 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ( Motion Docket Date 7/14/2023.), Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Suncor Marketing, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, William)
June 20, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC, filed.(Neuer, Raymond)
June 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc., Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc., Suncor Marketing, Inc., filed. (Vandenbout, Justin)
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th Judicial District, Harris County, Texas, case number 2023-28065 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30058455) filed by Kevin Fleming, Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Errata G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neuer, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine et al v. Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Valentine
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Williams
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Brooks
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Deer Park, LLC
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: William Oliver Martin
Represented By: Justin Edward Vandenbout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Vandenbout
Represented By: William Oliver Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Vandenbout
Represented By: William Oliver Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Fleming
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPC Industrial Services, LLC (f/k/a HydroChem LLC)
Represented By: Raymond A Neuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?