Vanderzwet v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Teri June Vanderzwet
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2023cv02307
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time answer-transcript by Kilolo Kijakazi, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 order granting extension)(Tucker, Eric)
August 21, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi, filed.(Tucker, Eric)
August 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Tucker on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi, filed. (Tucker, Eric)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teri June Vanderzwet, filed.(Osterhout, Karl)
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Teri June Vanderzwet, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2023. (Osterhout, Karl)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30107577) (Commissioner of SSA and U.S. Attorney served by NEF at the designated email addresses.) filed by Teri June Vanderzwet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanderzwet v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri June Vanderzwet
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Eric Bradford Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?