Black v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Defendant: J.B. Black, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Wilmington Saving Fund Society, FSB and Does 1 to 5
Case Number: 4:2023cv02343
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #19 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:23-cv-02343 and Member Case No. 4:23-cv-02783 by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(Jennings, William)
August 15, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #19 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:23-cv-02343 and Member Case No. 4:23-cv-02783 by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(Jennings, William)
August 3, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:23-cv-02343 and Member Case No. 4:23-cv-02783 by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order to consolidate cases)(Jennings, William)
August 3, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION in Opposition to Deft's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Wilmington Saving Fund Society, FSB. (Jennings, William)
August 3, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Wilmington Saving Fund Society, FSB. (Jennings, William)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - the court concludes that Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand and #7 Motion to Remand should be and are hereby DENIED because this action was timely and appropriately removed to this court based on diversity jurisdiction. Plaintiff seeks a temporary restraining order to prevent a July 5, 2023, foreclosure sale. On June 28, 2023, plaintiff filed a Chapter 13 bankruptcy case in this court (Case No. 23-32349, assigned to Judge Christopher M. Lopez). Although the bankruptcy case was dismissed on July 14, 2023, the automatic bankruptcy stay prevented the July 5, 2023, foreclosure sale. Since plaintiff no longer faces the likelihood of irreparable injury, #4 AMENDED PETITION for Declaratory Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief and #5 AMENDED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order are DENIED. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 20, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Bush re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Jennings, William)
July 20, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, #6 MOTION to Remand, filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order Exhibit)(Jennings, William)
July 20, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Deft's Motion to Dismiss by J.B. Black, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2023. (HortenciaLerma, 4)
July 20, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jennings, William)
July 17, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Saving Fund Society, FSB, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jennings, William)
July 17, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(Jennings, William)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(Jennings, William)
July 10, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(Jennings, William)
July 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by J.B. Black, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION for Declaratory Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by J.B. Black. Related document: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.. Motion Docket Date 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)This document is a duplicate of #4 ; this entry was made for case management purposes.(RebeccaBecknal, 4)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Declaratory Judgment and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief filed by J.B. Black. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(RebeccaBecknal, 4)
July 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by J.B. Black, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/22/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AkeitaMichael, 4)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th district court, case number 202333879 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30115975) filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit C3, #6 Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit C5, #8 Exhibit C6, #9 Exhibit C7, #10 Exhibit C8, #11 Exhibit C9, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit D1, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G, #17 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennings, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: William David Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Saving Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: William David Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?