Dragon Stone Energy LTD. v. Binder Science, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dragon Stone Energy LTD.
Defendant: Binder Science, LLC and Thomas Hynan Wentzler
Case Number: 4:2023cv02721
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Filing 37 Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Dragon Stone Energy LTD., filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
September 11, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Renjian Zhang on behalf of Dragon Stone Energy LTD., filed. (Zhang, Renjian)
September 11, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Klepin on behalf of Dragon Stone Energy LTD., filed. (Klepin, Christina)
September 8, 2023 Filing 34 ANSWER to #24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Dragon Stone Energy LTD., filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 29, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #30 Transcript, #31 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (HeatherCarr, 4)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiff's Verified First Amended Original Complaint; Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not issue; and Motion for Expediated Discovery (Document No. #6 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Emergency Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order, or, In the Alternative, Motion to Clarify and Modify Temporary Restraining Order (Document No. #19 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The TRO shall expire on August 28, 2023, and no further injunctive relief will go into effect. The parties will attend an initial scheduling conference and receive a scheduling order in the regular order of proceedings. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
August 28, 2023 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT re: Injunction hearing - Day 2 held on August 22, 2023, before Judge David Hittner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2023., filed. (Dye, Gayle)
August 28, 2023 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT re: Injunction hearing - Day 1 held on August 21, 2023, before Judge David Hittner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dye. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2023., filed. (Dye, Gayle)
August 24, 2023 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law for Application for Preliminary Injunction re: #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 24, 2023 Filing 28 Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law by Binder Science, LLC, Thomas Hynan Wentzler(Arisco, Christopher)
August 22, 2023 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Hittner. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/22/2023. Witness testimony heard. Proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law due by Thursday, 08/24/2023 by 12:00 noon. Written order to follow by Monday, 08/28/2023. Appearances: George A Pence, Henna Ghafoor.(Court Reporter: Dye), filed.(JosephWells, 4)
August 22, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Pence on behalf of Binder Science, LLC, Thomas Hynan Wentzler, filed. (Pence, George)
August 21, 2023 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Hittner. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 8/21/2023. Evidence entered. Testimony taken. Continued to next day. Injunction Hearing set for 8/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner Appearances:Christina Klepin, Ethan Zhang, George Pence. Henna Ghafoor.(Court Reporter: Dye), filed.(JosephWells, 4)
August 21, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Dragon Stone Energy LTD. by Binder Science, LLC, filed.(Gibbons, Brandon)
August 21, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time Response to First Amended Complaint by Thomas Hynan Wentzler, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Brandon)
August 21, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Binder Science, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Prop Order)(Gibbons, Brandon)
August 21, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Vacate #9 Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Dragon Stone Energy LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction)(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 21, 2023 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER re: #19 MOTION to Vacate #9 Temporary Restraining Order, filed.(Arisco, Christopher)
August 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Vacate #9 Temporary Restraining Order by Binder Science, LLC, Thomas Hynan Wentzler, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Arisco, Christopher)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J. Gibbons on behalf of Binder Science, LLC, Thomas Hynan Wentzler, filed. (Gibbons, Brandon)
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher V. Arisco on behalf of Binder Science, LLC, Thomas Hynan Wentzler, filed. (Arisco, Christopher)
August 18, 2023 Filing 16 Exhibit List by Dragon Stone Energy LTD.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 18, 2023 Filing 15 Witness List by Dragon Stone Energy LTD.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Temporary Restraining order is extended an additional 14 days until August 28, 2023. The Court Further ORDERS that Defendants be given notice of and appear at the hearing on Dragon Stone's application for a preliminary injunction on August 21, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dragon Stone Energy LTD., filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 11, 2023 Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/14/2023 at 01:30 PM is terminated. (JosephWells, 4)
August 9, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of Service Executed as to Phillip Proctor c/o Wolfex on 08/07/2023 re: Subpoena to Appear and Testify, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 9, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN of Service Executed as to Dylan Cowen c/o Wolfex on 08/07/2023 re: Subpoena to Appear and Testify, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 9, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to Thomas Wentzler on 08/09/2023 re: Subpoena to Appear and Testify, filed.(Ghafoor, Henna)
August 2, 2023 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by Mosaic Paradigm Law/Henna Ghafoor in the amount of $500.00, receipt number 400000966 re: #9 Temporary Restraining Order, filed. (RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4)
August 1, 2023 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Hittner. MOTION HEARING held on 8/1/2023. Motion for TRO granted. Written order to issue. Motion for expedited discovery denied at this time. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner Appearances: Henna Ghafoor. No appearance by defendant.(Court Reporter: Dye), filed.(JosephWells, 4)
July 31, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing re: TRO set for 8/1/2023 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner, filed. (JosephWells, 4)
July 31, 2023 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dragon Stone Energy LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order on TRO, #4 Proposed Order on Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Ghafoor, Henna)
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service on Thomas Wentzler)(Ghafoor, Henna)
July 27, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(RebeccaBecknal, 4)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Issuance of Summons - THOMAS HYNAN WENTZLER)(Ghafoor, Henna)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30253452) filed by Dragon Stone Energy LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Ghafoor, Henna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dragon Stone Energy LTD. v. Binder Science, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dragon Stone Energy LTD.
Represented By: Henna Ghafoor
Represented By: Christina Klepin
Represented By: Renjian Ethan Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binder Science, LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Arisco
Represented By: Brandon James Gibbons
Represented By: George A Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hynan Wentzler
Represented By: Christopher V Arisco
Represented By: Brandon James Gibbons
Represented By: George A Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?