United National Insurance Company v. Martin, Jr.
Defendant: Vincent Martin, Jr.
Counter Claimant: United National Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Collectibles Insurance Services LLC, Andrea Lamister Miloszenski, Mario Zermano, McLarens, Global Indemnity Group Inc., Heather Kovatich GBLI, Fred Schuchart, Esq. and Cooper and Scully P.C.
Case Number: 4:2023cv03084
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 10/18/2023 (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RhondaHawkins)
October 16, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by United National Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Of Dismissal)(Shuchart, Fred)
October 11, 2023 Filing 28 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Cooper and Scully P.C., Fred Schuchart, Esq., filed.(Milch, Stewart)
October 11, 2023 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cooper and Scully P.C., Fred Schuchart, Esq., filed.(Milch, Stewart)
October 11, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cooper and Scully P.C., Fred Schuchart, Esq., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milch, Stewart)
October 10, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION Requesting Hearing/ Proposed Notice of Hearing. by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (KimberlyPicota, 4)
October 10, 2023 Filing 31 Opposed Emergency Motion to Move for Order of Dismissal Rule 41(B) Order of Mistrial. by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(KimberlyPicota, 4)
October 10, 2023 Filing 30 Opposed Emergency MOTION for Order Sanctioning the Prosecution by Censure and Disqualification of Counsel. by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(KimberlyPicota, 4)
October 10, 2023 Filing 29 Opposed Motion to Move for Order of Sanctions Against the Prosecution by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2023) (KimberlyPicotaOpposed Motion to Move for Order of Sanctions Against the Prosecution by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(KimberlyPicota, 4) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2023) (KimberlyPicota, 4). , 4).
October 9, 2023 Filing 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Collectibles Insurance Services LLC, filed.(Shuchart, Fred)
October 9, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Collectibles Insurance Services LLC by Collectibles Insurance Services LLC, filed.(Shuchart, Fred)
October 9, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United National Insurance Company, filed.(Shuchart, Fred)
October 9, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Global Indemnity Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shuchart, Fred)
October 9, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by United National Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shuchart, Fred)
October 6, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Order/ Petition Hearing filed by United National Insurance Company. (Shuchart, Fred)
October 4, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (ShannonJones, 4)
September 29, 2023 Filing 18 FILLING EXHIBIT K, associated with the Defense's First Count Complaint Third Party Complaint/Response Document by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed.(JoanDavenport, 4)
September 29, 2023 Filing 17 Filing Proof of Service Associated with the Defense's Response and Third Party Complaint by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed.(JoanDavenport, 4)
September 29, 2023 Filing 16 FILING EXHIBIT J Associated with Defenses's First Count Complaint Third Party Complaint/Response Document by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed.(JoanDavenport, 4)
September 29, 2023 Filing 15 Rule 26 Discovery Disclosures and Defense Discovery Plan by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed.(JoanDavenport, 4)
September 29, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against United National Insurance Company by United National Insurance Company, filed.(Shuchart, Fred)
September 29, 2023 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by United National Insurance Company, filed.(Shuchart, Fred)
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION To Proceed Litigant filed by Cooper and Scully P.C.. (Shuchart, Fred)
September 21, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION Demanding Access Accomodation filed by Cooper and Scully P.C.. (Shuchart, Fred)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Collectibles Insurance Services LLC, Andrea Lamister Miloszenski, Mario Zermano, McLarens, Global Indemnity Group Inc., Heather Kovatich GBLI, Fred Schuchart, Esq., Cooper and Scully P.C. filed by Vincent Martin, Jr.(JacquelineMata, 4)
September 14, 2023 THIRD Party Summons Issued as to Collectibles Insurance Services LLC, Cooper and Scully P.C., Global Indemnity Group Inc., Heather Kovatich GBLI, McLarens, Andrea Lamister Miloszenski, Fred Schuchart, Esq., Mario Zermano. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
September 13, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #1 Complaint and Defendant's First Counter Complaint and Third Party Complaint filed by Vincent Martin, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - I)(DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) Modified on 9/14/2023 (DMcKinnieRichardson, 4).
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Vincent A. Martin re: self-representation and court accommodations for pro se litigants, filed. (AkeitaMichael, 4)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE/ Counter Filing Request by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Order/ Petition Hearing Request by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/26/2023. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Representation by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 1, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION To Proceed Litigant Pro Se by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2023. (BrendaLacy, 4)
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 EX PARTE Defense Motion Demanding Access Accomodation by Vincent Martin, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Letter)(TerriHanniable, 4)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 09:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RebeccaBecknal, 4)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vincent Martin, Jr. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30391919) filed by United National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Unredacted attachment Waiver of Summons, #4 Unredacted attachment Notice of Waiver of Summons)(Shuchart, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United National Insurance Company v. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: United National Insurance Company
Represented By: Fred Lawrence Shuchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Collectibles Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Fred Lawrence Shuchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Andrea Lamister Miloszenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mario Zermano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: McLarens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Global Indemnity Group Inc.
Represented By: Fred Lawrence Shuchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Heather Kovatich GBLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fred Schuchart, Esq.
Represented By: Stewart G. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cooper and Scully P.C.
Represented By: Stewart G. Milch
Represented By: Fred Lawrence Shuchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?