Curry, Jr. v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: George Thomas Curry, Jr.
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2023cv03144
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Death Penalty)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for M. Bradley Taylor to Withdraw as Attorney by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harbison, Emily)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re: #29 Proposed Order (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4)
September 22, 2023 Filing 29 Joint PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Abell, Katherine)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan M. Pate (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30426233) (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(MayraMarquez, 4)
September 7, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Abell on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Abell, Katherine)
September 6, 2023 Filing 26 Redacted Copy of Vol. 8, Exhibits 115-134 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 09] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 25 Redacted Copy of Vol. 7, Exhibits 109-114 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 08] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 24 Redacted Copy of Vol. 6, Exhibits 77-108 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 07] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 23 Redacted Copy of Vol. 5, Exhibits 63-76 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 06] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 22 Redacted Copy of Vol. 4, Exhibits 48-62 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 05] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 21 Redacted Copy of Vol. 3, Exhibits 18-47 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 04] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 Redacted Copy of Vol. 2, Exhibits 3-17 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 03] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
September 6, 2023 Filing 19 Redacted Copy of Vol. 1, Exhibits 1-2 to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF 02] by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed.(Harbison, Emily)
August 29, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C. Johnson on behalf of George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Johnson, Gary)
August 28, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan M. Pate (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30426233) by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/18/2023. (Harbison, Emily)
August 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Fontenot on behalf of George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Fontenot, Jordan)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Russell on behalf of George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Russell, William)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Bradley Taylor on behalf of George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Taylor, Michael)
August 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily P. Harbison on behalf of George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4)
August 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Stewart-Klein on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Stewart-Klein, Ellen)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBITS 115-134 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBITS 109-114 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBITS 77-108 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBITS 63-76 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 SEALED EXHIBITS 48-62 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED EXHIBITS 18-47 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBITS 3-17 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBITS 1-2 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Thomas Curry, Jr., filed. (Harbison, Emily)
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ATXSDC-30410506) filed by George Thomas Curry, Jr..(Harbison, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry, Jr. v. Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Thomas Curry, Jr.
Represented By: Emily P Harbison
Represented By: Gary Craig Johnson
Represented By: Michael Bradley Taylor
Represented By: Jordan Lee Fontenot
Represented By: Ryan M. Pate
Represented By: William W Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Ellen Stewart-Klein
Represented By: Katherine Davis Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?