Texas Bank and Trust v. English et al
Plaintiff: Texas Bank and Trust N A and Texas Bank and Trust
Defendant: Terry English, PPB Inc., U.S. Department of the Treasury and United States Treasury
Case Number: 4:2023cv04128
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to PPB Inc. served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024, filed. (KimberlyPicota, 4).
December 21, 2023 Filing Fee Filing fee: $405 re: #1 Complaint in Interpleader, receipt number 400003490, filed. (KimberlyPicota, 4)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Terry English served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to U.S. Department of the Treasury served on 12/15/2023, answer due 2/13/2024, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to PPB Inc. served on 12/15/2023, answer due 1/5/2024, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to PPB Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to PPB Inc., filed.(Huttenbach, William)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Treasury. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to PPB Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Terry English. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to PPB Inc., filed.(Huttenbach, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Terry English, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
November 16, 2023 The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (ByronThomas, 4)
November 10, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Bank and Trust, filed.(Huttenbach, William)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4)
October 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30740401) filed by Texas Bank and Trust N A.(Huttenbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Bank and Trust v. English et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Bank and Trust N A
Represented By: William Patterson Huttenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Bank and Trust
Represented By: Stormy Leighann Strickland
Represented By: William Patterson Huttenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPB Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?