Tap Rock Resources LLC v. Marathon Oil Permian LLC
Plaintiff: Tap Rock Resources LLC
Defendant: Marathon Oil Permian, LLC and Tap Rock Minerals, LP
Case Number: 4:2023cv04518
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tap Rock Resources LLC, filed.(Binns, Gregory)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marathon Oil Permian, LLC, filed.(Brandl, Anna)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D. Binns on behalf of Tap Rock Resources LLC, filed. (Binns, Gregory)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Jeffery D. Kuhnhenn to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(GabrielleLyons, 4)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Anna Brandl to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (GlendaHassan, 4)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna Brandl (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30938158) by Marathon Oil Permian, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2024. (Patel, Niravkumar)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffery D. Kuhnhenn (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30936614) by Marathon Oil Permian, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2024. (Patel, Niravkumar)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Niravkumar N. Patel on behalf of Marathon Oil Permian, LLC, filed. (Patel, Niravkumar)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/16/2024 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison( Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Case transferred in from New Mexico. Case Number 2:23-cv-00850; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue re 6 Supplemental MOTION for Supplement to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. (cmm)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Marathon Oil Permian LLC re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Marathon Oil Permian LLC (Kuhnhenn, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Kuhnhenn, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Deadline by Marathon Oil Permian LLC (Kuhnhenn, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 Supplemental MOTION for Supplement to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue filed by Tap Rock Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Cloutier, Andrew)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tap Rock Resources LLC (Cloutier, Andrew)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Tap Rock Resources LLC of Certificate of Good Standing Filed in Support of Out of District Attorney Julie C. Abernethy (Cloutier, Andrew)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Tap Rock Resources LLC of Certificate of Good Standing Filed in Support of Out of District Attorney Gregory D. Binns (Cloutier, Andrew)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Tap Rock Resources LLC by Andrew J. Cloutier on behalf of: Julie C. Abernethy Holland & Knight LLP 1722 Routh Street, #1500Dallas, TX 75201 2149691700 julie.abernethy@hklaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Cloutier, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Tap Rock Resources LLC by Andrew J. Cloutier on behalf of: Gregory D. Binns Holland & Knight LLP 1722 Routh Street, #1500Dallas, TX 75201 (214) 969-1700 greg.binns@hklaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Cloutier, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9049719 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tap Rock Resources LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cloutier, Andrew)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9049693 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tap Rock Resources LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cloutier, Andrew)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Tap Rock Resources LLC (Cloutier, Andrew)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (atc)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter GRANTING #7 Agreed Motion to Seal [6-1] Exhibit B to 6 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (ama)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Oil Permian LLC (Brandl, Anna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Brandl, Anna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 6 Supplemental MOTION for Supplement to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Exhibit B by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Brandl, Anna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Brandl, Anna)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION to Transfer Case Transfer Venue by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Brandl, Anna) Modified pursuant to a call received on helpdesk on 10/3/2023. They will refile to include the exhibits (arp).
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-9030616 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marathon Oil Permian LLC from Fifth Judicial District Eddy County New Mexico, case number D-503-CV-2023-00448. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Brandl, Anna) filed by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marathon Oil Permian LLC from Fifth Judicial District Eddy County New Mexico, case number D-503-CV-2023-00448. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Marathon Oil Permian LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Brandl, Anna)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (bc)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tap Rock Resources LLC v. Marathon Oil Permian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tap Rock Resources LLC
Represented By: Julie C. Abernethy
Represented By: Andrew J Cloutier
Represented By: Gregory D Binns
Represented By: Gregory Daniel Binns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Permian, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Kuhnhenn
Represented By: Anna Brandl
Represented By: Niravkumar N Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tap Rock Minerals, LP
Represented By: Andrew J Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?