Cavallo v. Hotel Finance Partners Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Cavallo
Defendant: Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz and Zane D Russell
Case Number: 4:2024cv00884
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #27 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDITION, filed by Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Clarkson, Gavin)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 05/06/2024.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jmg4)
April 18, 2024 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Teresa Cavallo, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thomas, William)
April 15, 2024 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #27 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDITION, filed by Teresa Cavallo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed and Notarized Verification) (McHugh, John)
April 9, 2024 Filing 31 STATEMENT Rule 7.1 Disclosure of Interested Parties by Teresa Cavallo, filed. (Nordberg, Mallory)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 7/26/2024 Pltf Expert Report due by 2/25/2025. Deft Expert Report due by 3/27/2025. Discovery due by 5/13/2025. Mediation due by 7/29/2025. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/12/2025. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/12/2025. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/28/2025. Docket Call set for 10/21/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jmg4)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion for John M. McHugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jmg4)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Mallory P. Nordberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jmg4)
March 25, 2024 Filing 27 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDITION by Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2024. (Clarkson, Gavin)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified. (jmg4)
March 22, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomas on behalf of Teresa Cavallo, filed. (Thomas, William)
March 22, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Goodland on behalf of Teresa Cavallo, filed. (Goodland, Ryan)
March 13, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John M. McHugh (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-31321352) by Teresa Cavallo, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2024. (McHugh, John)
March 13, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Motion Filing Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-31321334 for John M. McHugh (re: #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ), filed.(McHugh, John)
March 12, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mallory P. Nordberg (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-31318882) by Teresa Cavallo, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2024. (Nordberg, Mallory)
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 Case transferred in from Colorado. Case Number 1:24-cv-00169; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The #14 Motion to Transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/8/2024.(schap, )
March 8, 2024 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell, filed by Teresa Cavallo.(McHugh, John)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 DEFENDANTS' AGREED AND STIPULATED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2024 and its associated deadlines are VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/8/2024. Text Only Entry(stvlc4, )
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #16 Notice of Amended Complaint and [16-1] First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, which contains a redline of Plaintiff's revisions as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. On or before 3/15/2024, Plaintiff shall file a clean version of the amended complaint, to be docketed as the First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/8/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Notice of, with attached First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand) against Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell, filed by Teresa Cavallo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(McHugh, John)
March 7, 2024 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendants Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Clarkson, Gavin)
March 7, 2024 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Clarkson, Gavin)
March 6, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Clarkson, Gavin)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 STATEMENT Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Teresa Cavallo. (McHugh, John)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Motion to Transfer is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants may file a renewed motion that addresses the deficiencies identified by this Order on or before 3/14/2024. By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 03/01/2024.(jrobe, ) (jrobe, ). Modified to correct document title on 3/1/2024 (jrobe, ).
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Order)(Clarkson, Gavin)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of the docket. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), all parties in a diversity case must, with their first appearance, file a disclosure statement that names and identifies the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. The Committee Notes state that "[d]isclosure is required by a plaintiff" and the disclosure "is designed to facilitate an early and accurate determination of jurisdiction." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Advisory Comm. Notes). Every party has now made an appearance. Moreover, pursuant to #4 Order, each party was to ensure that the citizenship disclosure statement required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) had been filed on or before 2/28/2024. No party has filed a compliant Rule 7.1(a) disclosure statement. Accordingly, the parties shall file citizenship disclosure statements as required by Rule 7.1(a)(2) on or before 3/6/2024. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/29/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #5 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/29/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel by Defendants Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell. (Clarkson, Gavin)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of #5 Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (the "Consent Form"). While the Consent Form appears to be signed by both parties, counsel for Defendants has not yet made an entry of appearance. Accordingly, the Court is unable to seek an order of reference at this time. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/28/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Teresa Cavallo All parties consent.. (McHugh, John)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/19/2024. Citizenship Disclosure Statement due by 2/28/2024. Consent Form due by 2/28/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/6/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hotel Finance Partners Inc., Daniel Lee Ritz, Zane D Russell (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9495009)Attorney John Michael McHugh added to party Teresa Cavallo(pty:pla), filed by Teresa Cavallo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McHugh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavallo v. Hotel Finance Partners Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Cavallo
Represented By: John Michael McHugh
Represented By: John McHugh
Represented By: William Benjamin Thomas
Represented By: Mallory Nordberg
Represented By: Ryan Michael Goodland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotel Finance Partners Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Stuart Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lee Ritz
Represented By: Gavin Stuart Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane D Russell
Represented By: Gavin Stuart Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?