Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC v. Gulf Process Gas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC
Defendant: Gulf Process Gas, LLC and Extiel GPG, LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv01427
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 7/11/2024..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (aar4)
June 3, 2024 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC. (Kraus, Jason)
June 3, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Daniels, Douglas)
June 2, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion) (Kraus, Jason)
May 27, 2024 Filing 12 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Extiel GPG, LLC re: Summons in Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Exs. A and B, filed. (Daniels, Douglas)
May 27, 2024 Filing 11 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Gulf Process Gas, LLC re: Summons in Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Exs. A and B, filed. (Daniels, Douglas)
May 21, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Daniels, Douglas)
May 21, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Daniels, Douglas)
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 Letter to Court regarding Hearing and Plea in Abatement by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Daniels, Douglas)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 Letter to Court regarding Plea in Abatement by Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC, filed. (Kraus, Jason)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC, filed. (Daniels, Douglas)
May 2, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corporate Forfeiture Letter) (Kraus, Jason)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (mew4)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (acj4)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons) (Daniels, Douglas)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Extiel GPG, LLC, Gulf Process Gas, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BTXSDC-31501575) filed by Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, Bridge Loan Agreement 10/6/17, #3 Exhibit B, Bridge Loan Agreement, 7/25/18, #4 Appendix Appendix to Cover Sheet-Plaintiff's Counsel List) (Daniels, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC v. Gulf Process Gas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Fundamentals Group, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Process Gas, LLC
Represented By: Jason David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extiel GPG, LLC
Represented By: Jason David Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?