Poleon v. Navy Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Kieria Poleon
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 4:2024cv01464
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 7/25/2024 at 02:30 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (aar4)
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Navy Federal Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Hess, Michael)
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (bli4)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (bli4)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navy Federal Credit Union, filed. (Hess, Michael)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 202402270 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31509135) filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hess, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poleon v. Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kieria Poleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Michael Barrett Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?