Ross v. Stellar Bank
Plaintiff: Haywood Ross
Defendant: Stellar Bank
Case Number: 4:2024cv01842
Filed: May 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stellar Bank, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation) (Mayer, John)
May 31, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Stellar Bank served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024, filed. (ddb4)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (srh4)
May 16, 2024 Summons and USM 285 Issued as to Stellar Bank and delivered to U.S. Marshal's in person for service., filed. (srh4)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Haywood Ross, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (dah4)
May 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stellar Bank filed by Haywood Ross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Application to Proceed IFP Granted on May 8, 2024 by Judge Hanen. (srh4) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Stellar Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haywood Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Bank
Represented By: John S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?