United States of America v. Baeza
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Karla Baeza
Case Number: 4:2024cv01851
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Karla Baeza served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (ddb4)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Karla Baeza. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (mew4)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Karla Baeza, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karla Baeza filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - COI) (Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?