United States of America v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kristy Hernandez and Michael Hernandez
Case Number: 4:2024cv01853
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Granting #9 Request for Entry of Default and it is ORDERED that default is entered against Defendants, Kristy Hernandez and Michael Hernandez, pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Within 20 (twenty) days from the entry of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to: (a) move for judgment by default; (b) submit affidavits with supporting documentation of plaintiffs damages; (c) submit affidavit evidence on attorney's fees; and (d) submit a proposed Final Judgment. ** The August 30, 2024, Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (sra4)
July 3, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Kristy Hernandez, Michael Hernandez by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Entry of Default) (Cersonsky, M)
July 2, 2024 Filing 8 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by United States of America, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 30, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Michael Hernandez served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 30, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kristy Hernandez served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/30/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (ddb4)
May 17, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kristy Hernandez, Michael Hernandez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (mew4)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Kristy Hernandez, Michael Hernandez, filed. (Cersonsky, M)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristy Hernandez, Michael Hernandez filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - COI) (Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?