Tyson v. Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Plaintiff: David Tyson
Defendant: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Case Number: 4:2024cv04813
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Kirby's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Kirby Inland Marine, LP, filed. (Brinson, Jamila)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Tyson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lazarz, Mark)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Kirby Inland Marine, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Brinson, #2 Exhibit Request for Issuance, #3 Proposed Order) (Brinson, Jamila)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Crespin Linton II on behalf of Kirby Inland Marine, LP, filed. (Linton, Crespin)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (hlc4)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Richard W. Bennett randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hlc4)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Kirby Inland Marine, LP, filed. (Brinson, Jamila)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County Texas District Court, case number 2024-71780 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32596314) filed by Kirby Inland Marine, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4a, #6 Exhibit 4b) (Brinson, Jamila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tyson
Represented By: Mark G. Lazarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Inland Marine, LP
Represented By: Jamila Marie Brinson
Represented By: Crespin Michael Linton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?